Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Drunk and Drugged Driving

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0295 /CH0671
Title
Criminal Procedure - Criminal Injuries Compensation Board - Impaired Boating
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0371 (SB0312)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Drunk and Drugged Driving - Subsequent Offenders (Repeat Drunk Driving Offenders Act of 2017)
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0393
Title
Manslaughter and Homicide by Vehicle or Vessel - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0489
Title
Operating a Vehicle or Vessel - Injury to Others While Under the Influence of or Impaired by Alcohol or Drugs
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0635 /CH0168 (SB0229/CH0167)
Title
Criminal Law - Homicide by Motor Vehicle or Vessel While Impaired by a Controlled Dangerous Substance - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0757
Title
Evidence - Violation of Ignition Interlock System Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0783
Title
Vehicle Equipment - Driver Alcohol Detection System for Safety Program
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1068 (SB0972)
Title
Drugged Driving - Oral Fluid Tests - Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1105
Title
Driving While Impaired By Alcohol - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Ciliberti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1151
Title
Habitual Drunk Drivers - Mandatory Minimum Penalty
Sponsor
Delegate Ciliberti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1490
Title
Drunk Driving - Administrative Per Se Offenses - Ignition Interlock System Program
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0030
Title
Vessels - Operating While Under the Influence of or Impaired by Alcohol or Drugs
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0068
Title
Criminal Law - Veterans - Medical Cannabis
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0229 /CH0167 (HB0635/CH0168)
Title
Criminal Law - Homicide by Motor Vehicle or Vessel While Impaired by Controlled Dangerous Substance - Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0312 (HB0371)
Title
Drunk and Drugged Driving - Subsequent Offenders and Punitive Damages (Repeat Drunk Driving Offenders Act of 2017)
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0972 (HB1068)
Title
Drugged Driving - Oral Fluid Tests - Pilot Program
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0974
Title
Vehicle Laws - Driving With Detectable Levels of a Controlled Dangerous Substance or Its Metabolites - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1058
Title
Aggressive Drunk Driving - Punitive Damages
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1080
Title
State Boat Act - Privilege to Operate a Vessel - Suspension Authority
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0295 /CH0671 Criminal Procedure - Criminal Injuries Compensation Board - Impaired Boating Delegate Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 671
Judiciary
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0371 (SB0312) Vehicle Laws - Drunk and Drugged Driving - Subsequent Offenders (Repeat Drunk Driving Offenders Act of 2017) Speaker 3 2 In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Judiciary
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0393 Manslaughter and Homicide by Vehicle or Vessel - Penalties Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0489 Operating a Vehicle or Vessel - Injury to Others While Under the Influence of or Impaired by Alcohol or Drugs Delegate Wilson, B. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0635 /CH0168 (SB0229/CH0167) Criminal Law - Homicide by Motor Vehicle or Vessel While Impaired by a Controlled Dangerous Substance - Penalties Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 168
Judiciary
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0757 Evidence - Violation of Ignition Interlock System Requirement Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0783 Vehicle Equipment - Driver Alcohol Detection System for Safety Program Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1068 (SB0972) Drugged Driving - Oral Fluid Tests - Pilot Program Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1105 Driving While Impaired By Alcohol - Penalties Delegate Ciliberti 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1151 Habitual Drunk Drivers - Mandatory Minimum Penalty Delegate Ciliberti 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1490 Drunk Driving - Administrative Per Se Offenses - Ignition Interlock System Program Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0030 Vessels - Operating While Under the Influence of or Impaired by Alcohol or Drugs Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/17/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0068 Criminal Law - Veterans - Medical Cannabis Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/25/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0229 /CH0167 (HB0635/CH0168) Criminal Law - Homicide by Motor Vehicle or Vessel While Impaired by Controlled Dangerous Substance - Penalties Senator Cassilly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 167
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0312 (HB0371) Drunk and Drugged Driving - Subsequent Offenders and Punitive Damages (Repeat Drunk Driving Offenders Act of 2017) President 3 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0972 (HB1068) Drugged Driving - Oral Fluid Tests - Pilot Program Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0974 Vehicle Laws - Driving With Detectable Levels of a Controlled Dangerous Substance or Its Metabolites - Prohibition Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1058 Aggressive Drunk Driving - Punitive Damages Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1080 State Boat Act - Privilege to Operate a Vessel - Suspension Authority Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM