Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Drunk and Drugged Driving

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0142
Title
Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Road User - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0250
Title
Drunk and Drugged Driving - Subsequent Offenders - Concurrent Jurisdiction
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0324
Title
Manslaughter and Homicide by Vehicle or Vessel - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0349 (SB0296)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Drunk and Drugged Driving - Subsequent Offenders - Felonies (Repeat Drunk Driving Offenders Act of 2018)
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0595
Title
Evidence - Violation of Ignition Interlock System Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0711
Title
Driving While Impaired by Alcohol - Transporting a Minor - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Ciliberti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1204
Title
Task Force to Study Impaired Driving and New Technologies
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1205 (SB0722)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Alcohol- or Drug-Related Driving Offenses - Testing Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1264 (SB1039)
Title
Constitutional Amendment - Cannabis - Use, Possession, Cultivation, and Sale
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1391
Title
Driving Under the Influence of Alcohol - Subsequent Offenders - Mandatory Ignition Interlock
Sponsor
Delegate Ciliberti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1447
Title
Ignition Interlock System Program - Administrative Offenses - Out-of-State Licensed Drivers
Sponsor
Delegate Vallario
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0127
Title
Criminal Law and Vehicle Laws – Marijuana – Criminal Threshold and Smoking in Vehicles
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0296 (HB0349)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Drunk and Drugged Driving - Subsequent Offenders - Felonies (Repeat Drunk Driving Offenders Act of 2018)
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0722 (HB1205)
Title
Motor Vehicles – Alcohol– or Drug–Related Driving Offenses – Testing Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1039 (HB1264)
Title
Constitutional Amendment - Cannabis - Use, Possession, Cultivation, and Sale
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1150
Title
Vehicle Laws - Accidents Resulting in Death - Mandatory Drug and Alcohol Testing (Danshaun's Law)
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0142 Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Road User - Penalties Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB0250 Drunk and Drugged Driving - Subsequent Offenders - Concurrent Jurisdiction Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
1/31/2018 - 2:00 PM
HB0324 Manslaughter and Homicide by Vehicle or Vessel - Penalties Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
1/31/2018 - 2:00 PM
HB0349 (SB0296) Vehicle Laws - Drunk and Drugged Driving - Subsequent Offenders - Felonies (Repeat Drunk Driving Offenders Act of 2018) Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0595 Evidence - Violation of Ignition Interlock System Requirement Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
Judiciary
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0711 Driving While Impaired by Alcohol - Transporting a Minor - Penalties Delegate Ciliberti 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1204 Task Force to Study Impaired Driving and New Technologies Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/02/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1205 (SB0722) Motor Vehicles - Alcohol- or Drug-Related Driving Offenses - Testing Requirement Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/02/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1264 (SB1039) Constitutional Amendment - Cannabis - Use, Possession, Cultivation, and Sale Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1391 Driving Under the Influence of Alcohol - Subsequent Offenders - Mandatory Ignition Interlock Delegate Ciliberti 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/02/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1447 Ignition Interlock System Program - Administrative Offenses - Out-of-State Licensed Drivers Delegate Vallario 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/02/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0127 Criminal Law and Vehicle Laws – Marijuana – Criminal Threshold and Smoking in Vehicles Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/25/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0296 (HB0349) Vehicle Laws - Drunk and Drugged Driving - Subsequent Offenders - Felonies (Repeat Drunk Driving Offenders Act of 2018) President 3 2 In the Senate - Senate Requests House Recede
Judicial Proceedings
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0722 (HB1205) Motor Vehicles – Alcohol– or Drug–Related Driving Offenses – Testing Requirement Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1039 (HB1264) Constitutional Amendment - Cannabis - Use, Possession, Cultivation, and Sale Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1150 Vehicle Laws - Accidents Resulting in Death - Mandatory Drug and Alcohol Testing (Danshaun's Law) Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM