Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Juvenile Law (E3)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0196
Title
Juveniles - Pretrial Detention - Confinement in Juvenile Facilities
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0261
Title
Juvenile Causes - Disposition on Delinquency Petition - Required Considerations
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0266 (SB0498)
Title
Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0304 (SB0243)
Title
Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0506
Title
Juvenile Court Jurisdiction - Excluded Offenses - Natural Resources Violations
Sponsor
Delegate Ghrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0634 (SB0209)
Title
Juvenile Law - Adjudication of Delinquency - Collateral Consequences
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0811
Title
Juvenile Services - Child Victims of Human Trafficking
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1463 (SB0317/CH0063)
Title
Coordinating Council for Juvenile Services Educational Programs - Membership
Sponsor
Delegate Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1634 /CH0655 (SB1072)
Title
Task Force to Study the Restraint, Searches, and Needs of Children in the Juvenile Justice System
Sponsor
Delegate Jalisi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0081
Title
Juvenile Law - Continuum of Care - Repeal of Termination Date
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0149
Title
Juvenile Law - Citations for Violations
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0189
Title
Juveniles - Restraint and Searches - Limitations
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0209 (HB0634)
Title
Juvenile Law - Adjudication of Delinquency - Collateral Consequences
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0243 (HB0304)
Title
Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0317 /CH0063 (HB1463)
Title
Coordinating Council for Juvenile Services Educational Programs - Membership
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0325
Title
Juvenile Services Education - Modifications
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0498 (HB0266)
Title
Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1072 (HB1634/CH0655)
Title
Task Force to Study the Restraint, Searches, and Needs of Children in the Juvenile Justice System
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0196 Juveniles - Pretrial Detention - Confinement in Juvenile Facilities Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/04/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0261 Juvenile Causes - Disposition on Delinquency Petition - Required Considerations Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0266 (SB0498) Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0304 (SB0243) Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0506 Juvenile Court Jurisdiction - Excluded Offenses - Natural Resources Violations Delegate Ghrist 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0634 (SB0209) Juvenile Law - Adjudication of Delinquency - Collateral Consequences Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB0811 Juvenile Services - Child Victims of Human Trafficking Delegate Morales 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB1463 (SB0317/CH0063) Coordinating Council for Juvenile Services Educational Programs - Membership Delegate Patterson 2 2 Veto sustained (0-135)
Ways and Means
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1634 /CH0655 (SB1072) Task Force to Study the Restraint, Searches, and Needs of Children in the Juvenile Justice System Delegate Jalisi 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 655
Judiciary
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0081 Juvenile Law - Continuum of Care - Repeal of Termination Date Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
1/21/2016 - 1:30 PM
SB0149 Juvenile Law - Citations for Violations Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2016 - 1:30 PM
SB0189 Juveniles - Restraint and Searches - Limitations Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0209 (HB0634) Juvenile Law - Adjudication of Delinquency - Collateral Consequences Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0243 (HB0304) Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0317 /CH0063 (HB1463) Coordinating Council for Juvenile Services Educational Programs - Membership Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 63
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0325 Juvenile Services Education - Modifications Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0498 (HB0266) Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1072 (HB1634/CH0655) Task Force to Study the Restraint, Searches, and Needs of Children in the Juvenile Justice System Senator Muse 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:28 PM