Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Juvenile Law (E3)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0319 /CH0706 (SB0160/CH0707)
Title
Juvenile Law – Truancy
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0479 (SB1066)
Title
Juvenile Law - Lead Testing and Behavioral Health Assessment
Sponsor
Delegate Mosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0555 (SB0257)
Title
Juvenile Law - Records - Juveniles Charged as Adults
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0827 (SB0669)
Title
Juvenile Law - Juvenile Diversion Program
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1023 /CH0783 (SB0861)
Title
Juvenile Law – Witnesses – Body Attachment
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1508
Title
Baltimore City - Children - Records Access
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1524 (SB1134)
Title
Juvenile Justice Coordinating Council
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1550 (SB0863)
Title
Juvenile Law – Juvenile Court Jurisdiction
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1702 (SB1147)
Title
Juveniles - Reportable Offenses
Sponsor
Washington County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0091 /CH0669
Title
Juvenile Law - Disclosure of Court Records
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0160 /CH0707 (HB0319/CH0706)
Title
Juvenile Law – Truancy
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0257 (HB0555)
Title
Juvenile Law - Records - Juveniles Charged as Adults
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0669 (HB0827)
Title
Juvenile Law - Juvenile Diversion Program
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0861 (HB1023/CH0783)
Title
Juvenile Law - Witnesses - Body Attachment
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0863 (HB1550)
Title
Juvenile Law - Juvenile Court Jurisdiction
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1066 (HB0479)
Title
Juvenile Law - Lead Testing and Behavioral Health Assessment
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1134 (HB1524)
Title
Juvenile Justice Coordinating Council
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1147 (HB1702)
Title
Juveniles – Reportable Offenses
Sponsor
Washington County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0319 /CH0706 (SB0160/CH0707) Juvenile Law – Truancy Delegate Sydnor 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 706
Judiciary
2/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0479 (SB1066) Juvenile Law - Lead Testing and Behavioral Health Assessment Delegate Mosby 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0555 (SB0257) Juvenile Law - Records - Juveniles Charged as Adults Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0827 (SB0669) Juvenile Law - Juvenile Diversion Program Delegate West 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB1023 /CH0783 (SB0861) Juvenile Law – Witnesses – Body Attachment Delegate Clippinger 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 783
Judiciary
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1508 Baltimore City - Children - Records Access Delegate Anderson 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1524 (SB1134) Juvenile Justice Coordinating Council Delegate Clippinger 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Judiciary
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1550 (SB0863) Juvenile Law – Juvenile Court Jurisdiction Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1702 (SB1147) Juveniles - Reportable Offenses Washington County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0091 /CH0669 Juvenile Law - Disclosure of Court Records Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 669
Judicial Proceedings
1/17/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0160 /CH0707 (HB0319/CH0706) Juvenile Law – Truancy Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 707
Judicial Proceedings
1/24/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0257 (HB0555) Juvenile Law - Records - Juveniles Charged as Adults Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/01/2018 - 2:00 PM
SB0669 (HB0827) Juvenile Law - Juvenile Diversion Program Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0861 (HB1023/CH0783) Juvenile Law - Witnesses - Body Attachment Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0863 (HB1550) Juvenile Law - Juvenile Court Jurisdiction Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1066 (HB0479) Juvenile Law - Lead Testing and Behavioral Health Assessment Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1134 (HB1524) Juvenile Justice Coordinating Council Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1147 (HB1702) Juveniles – Reportable Offenses Washington County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM