Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Easements

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0378 /CH0108
Title
Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Fund - Easement Restriction - Reimbursement
Sponsor
Delegate Stocksdale
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0979 (SB0862)
Title
Real Property - Easements - Natural Gas Pipelines
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0984 (SB0604)
Title
Public Safety - Gas Pipelines - Construction Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1091 (SB0796)
Title
Agriculture - Easements - Renewable Energy Generation Facilities
Sponsor
Delegate Jameson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1324 (SB0396)
Title
Real Property - Use of Coercion, Threat, or Intimidation - Contracts Void
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0396 (HB1324)
Title
Real Property - Use of Coercion, Threat, or Intimidation - Contracts Void
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0604 (HB0984)
Title
Public Safety - Gas Pipelines - Construction Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0796 (HB1091)
Title
Agriculture - Easements - Renewable Energy Generation Facilities
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0862 (HB0979)
Title
Real Property - Easements - Natural Gas Pipelines
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0378 /CH0108 Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Fund - Easement Restriction - Reimbursement Delegate Stocksdale 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 108
Environmental Matters
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0979 (SB0862) Real Property - Easements - Natural Gas Pipelines Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/08/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0984 (SB0604) Public Safety - Gas Pipelines - Construction Requirements Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/08/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1091 (SB0796) Agriculture - Easements - Renewable Energy Generation Facilities Delegate Jameson 2 2 In the House - Referred to interim study by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
3/01/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1324 (SB0396) Real Property - Use of Coercion, Threat, or Intimidation - Contracts Void Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0396 (HB1324) Real Property - Use of Coercion, Threat, or Intimidation - Contracts Void Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0604 (HB0984) Public Safety - Gas Pipelines - Construction Requirements Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0796 (HB1091) Agriculture - Easements - Renewable Energy Generation Facilities Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0862 (HB0979) Real Property - Easements - Natural Gas Pipelines Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM
Click to return on the top page