Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Easements

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0789 (SB0709)
Title
Income Tax Credit - Preservation and Conservation Easements
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0861 (SB0259/CH0287)
Title
Agriculture - Easements - Renewable Energy Generation Facilities
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1352 /CH0654 (SB0964)
Title
Secretary of State and Attorney General - Charitable Enforcement and Protection of Charitable Assets
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1437
Title
Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Lot Release - Demonstrated Financial Hardship
Sponsor
Delegate Kach
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0071 /CH0012
Title
Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Value of Easement
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0259 /CH0287 (HB0861)
Title
Agriculture - Easements - Renewable Energy Generation Facilities
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0709 (HB0789)
Title
Income Tax Credit - Preservation and Conservation Easements
Sponsor
Senator Dyson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0964 (HB1352/CH0654)
Title
Secretary of State and Attorney General - Charitable Enforcement and Protection of Charitable Assets
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0789 (SB0709) Income Tax Credit - Preservation and Conservation Easements Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
HB0861 (SB0259/CH0287) Agriculture - Easements - Renewable Energy Generation Facilities Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Environmental Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1352 /CH0654 (SB0964) Secretary of State and Attorney General - Charitable Enforcement and Protection of Charitable Assets Delegate Morhaim 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 654
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1437 Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Lot Release - Demonstrated Financial Hardship Delegate Kach 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0071 /CH0012 Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Value of Easement Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 12
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/14/2014 - 3:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0259 /CH0287 (HB0861) Agriculture - Easements - Renewable Energy Generation Facilities Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 287
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Environmental Matters
SB0709 (HB0789) Income Tax Credit - Preservation and Conservation Easements Senator Dyson 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Budget and Taxation
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0964 (HB1352/CH0654) Secretary of State and Attorney General - Charitable Enforcement and Protection of Charitable Assets Senator Kelley 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM