Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Easements

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0217 (SB0285)
Title
Agricultural Land Preservation Easements - Overlay Easements, Rights-of-Way, or Servitudes
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0863
Title
State Agricultural and Conservation Property Interests - Solar Facilities (Right to Solar Farm)
Sponsor
Delegate Barve
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1174 (SB0254)
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Perpetual Conservation Easements
Sponsor
Delegate Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0254 (HB1174)
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Perpetual Conservation Easements
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0285 (HB0217)
Title
Agricultural Land Preservation Easements - Overlay Easements, Rights-of-Way, or Servitudes
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0703 /CH0394
Title
Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Participation in the Readiness and Environmental Protection Integration Program
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0975 /CH0662
Title
Real Property - Agricultural Land Preservation Easements - Separate Parcels
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0217 (SB0285) Agricultural Land Preservation Easements - Overlay Easements, Rights-of-Way, or Servitudes Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB0863 State Agricultural and Conservation Property Interests - Solar Facilities (Right to Solar Farm) Delegate Barve 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1174 (SB0254) Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Perpetual Conservation Easements Delegate Jackson 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0254 (HB1174) Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Perpetual Conservation Easements Senator Peters 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0285 (HB0217) Agricultural Land Preservation Easements - Overlay Easements, Rights-of-Way, or Servitudes Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0703 /CH0394 Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Participation in the Readiness and Environmental Protection Integration Program Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 394
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0975 /CH0662 Real Property - Agricultural Land Preservation Easements - Separate Parcels Senator Ready 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 662
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM