Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Easements

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0494
Title
Natural Resources - Land Trust Grant Fund - Grant Awards and Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Gilchrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0574 (SB0376/CH0184)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0935
Title
Agricultural Land Preservation Easements - Use of Land - Signs Forbidding Trespassing, Hunting, or the Destruction of Property
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1008
Title
Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Valuation of Easement
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1196
Title
Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays Critical Area - Buffer Establishment and Buffer Management Plan - Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1220
Title
Sewerage Systems - Residential Major Subdivisions in Tier III and Tier IV Areas
Sponsor
Delegate Rose
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1350 /CH0241
Title
Property Tax Assessments - Conservation Property - Alteration of Definition
Sponsor
Delegate Clark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1403 (SB0741/CH0334)
Title
Maryland Historical Trust - Properties Subject to Historic Preservation Easements - Waiver Process
Sponsor
Delegate Kittleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0025 /CH0127
Title
Real Property - Conservation Easements, Covenants, Restrictions, and Conditions - Recording Notice
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0058 /CH0130
Title
Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation – Board of Trustees and Elimination of District Agreements
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0376 /CH0184 (HB0574)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0634 /CH0277 (HB1357)
Title
Electric Cooperatives - Powers - Conducting or Communications Facilities
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0741 /CH0334 (HB1403)
Title
Secretary of Planning – Adaptive Reuse of Historic Properties – Study
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0978
Title
Real Property - Agricultural Land Preservation Easements - Separate Parcels
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0494 Natural Resources - Land Trust Grant Fund - Grant Awards and Funding Delegate Gilchrist 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB0574 (SB0376/CH0184) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds Carroll County Delegation 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Appropriations
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0935 Agricultural Land Preservation Easements - Use of Land - Signs Forbidding Trespassing, Hunting, or the Destruction of Property Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1008 Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Valuation of Easement Delegate Arentz 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1196 Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays Critical Area - Buffer Establishment and Buffer Management Plan - Exemption Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1220 Sewerage Systems - Residential Major Subdivisions in Tier III and Tier IV Areas Delegate Rose 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1350 /CH0241 Property Tax Assessments - Conservation Property - Alteration of Definition Delegate Clark 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 241
Ways and Means
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1403 (SB0741/CH0334) Maryland Historical Trust - Properties Subject to Historic Preservation Easements - Waiver Process Delegate Kittleman 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0025 /CH0127 Real Property - Conservation Easements, Covenants, Restrictions, and Conditions - Recording Notice Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 127
Judicial Proceedings
1/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0058 /CH0130 Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation – Board of Trustees and Elimination of District Agreements Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 130
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/22/2019 - 4:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0376 /CH0184 (HB0574) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds Carroll County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 184
Budget and Taxation
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0634 /CH0277 (HB1357) Electric Cooperatives - Powers - Conducting or Communications Facilities Senator Eckardt 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 277
Finance
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0741 /CH0334 (HB1403) Secretary of Planning – Adaptive Reuse of Historic Properties – Study Senator Hester 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 334
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0978 Real Property - Agricultural Land Preservation Easements - Separate Parcels Senator Serafini 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2019 - 12:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:23 PM