Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Eastern Shore

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1020 (SB0799)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Wicomico County - Tri-County Council Multi-Purpose Center
Sponsor
Delegate Sample-Hughes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1053 (SB0697)
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Workgroup to Evaluate Mental Health Care Delivery on the Eastern Shore
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1264
Title
Building Performance Standards - Fire Sprinkler System Exemptions
Sponsor
Delegate Ghrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0005 (SJ0005)
Title
Natural Resources - Goose and Duck Hunting Seasons - Extension
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0007 (SJ0006)
Title
Business and Economic Development - NASA Wallops Flight Facility - Commercial Rocket Boosters and Spacecraft
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0697 (HB1053)
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Workgroup to Evaluate Mental Health Care Delivery on the Eastern Shore
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0799 (HB1020)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Wicomico County - Tri-County Council Multi-Purpose Center
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0005 (HJ0005)
Title
Natural Resources - Goose and Duck Hunting Seasons - Extension
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0006 (HJ0007)
Title
Business and Economic Development - NASA Wallops Flight Facility - Commercial Rocket Boosters and Spacecraft
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1020 (SB0799) Creation of a State Debt - Wicomico County - Tri-County Council Multi-Purpose Center Delegate Sample-Hughes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/14/2015 - 3:00 PM
HB1053 (SB0697) Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Workgroup to Evaluate Mental Health Care Delivery on the Eastern Shore Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1264 Building Performance Standards - Fire Sprinkler System Exemptions Delegate Ghrist 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HJ0005 (SJ0005) Natural Resources - Goose and Duck Hunting Seasons - Extension Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/09/2015 - 1:00 PM
HJ0007 (SJ0006) Business and Economic Development - NASA Wallops Flight Facility - Commercial Rocket Boosters and Spacecraft Delegate Adams 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 3:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/30/2015 - 3:00 PM
SB0697 (HB1053) Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Workgroup to Evaluate Mental Health Care Delivery on the Eastern Shore Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0799 (HB1020) Creation of a State Debt - Wicomico County - Tri-County Council Multi-Purpose Center Senator Mathias 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/14/2015 - 1:00 PM
SJ0005 (HJ0005) Natural Resources - Goose and Duck Hunting Seasons - Extension Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 3:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/30/2015 - 3:00 PM
SJ0006 (HJ0007) Business and Economic Development - NASA Wallops Flight Facility - Commercial Rocket Boosters and Spacecraft Senator Mathias 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 3:00 p.m.
Finance
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/30/2015 - 3:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM