Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Eastern Shore

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0904 (SB0546/CH0760)
Title
Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Monitoring and Enforcement
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1397
Title
State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Eastern Shore Veterans' Organizations
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0546 /CH0760 (HB0904)
Title
Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Monitoring and Enforcement
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0756
Title
Community Development - Rural Maryland Opportunity Zone Fund
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1010 /CH0406
Title
Maryland Health Care Commission - Assessment of Services at the University of Maryland Shore Medical Center in Chestertown
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1018
Title
Health Facilities - Chestertown Rural Health Care Delivery Innovations Pilot Program
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0904 (SB0546/CH0760) Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Monitoring and Enforcement Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1397 State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Eastern Shore Veterans' Organizations Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0546 /CH0760 (HB0904) Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Monitoring and Enforcement Senator Pinsky 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 760
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0756 Community Development - Rural Maryland Opportunity Zone Fund Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB1010 /CH0406 Maryland Health Care Commission - Assessment of Services at the University of Maryland Shore Medical Center in Chestertown Senator Hershey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 406
Finance
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/03/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB1018 Health Facilities - Chestertown Rural Health Care Delivery Innovations Pilot Program Senator Hershey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/03/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:23 PM