Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Education, State Board of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0225 /CH0155 (SB0273/CH0154)
Title
Veterans Full Employment Act of 2013
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0413 (SB0010)
Title
Baltimore County - Board of Education - Selection of Members
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0517 (SB0434)
Title
State Board of Education - Social Impact Bonds - Request for Proposals
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0532 (SB0537)
Title
Education - Maryland Advisory Council for Virtual Learning - Responsibilities
Sponsor
Delegate Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0684
Title
Tobacco-Free Schools Act
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0843
Title
State Board of Education - Financial Literacy Curriculum - Graduation Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Walker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0844 (SB0694)
Title
Public School Teachers - Certification - Continuing Education
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0855
Title
Student Health and Fitness Act
Sponsor
Delegate Walker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0875
Title
Education - Public Schools - Parent Empowerment
Sponsor
Delegate Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1245 (SB0822)
Title
Mental Health and Substance Use Disorder Safety Net Act of 2013
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1376 (SB0734)
Title
State Board of Education - Mathematics - Graduation Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Griffith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0010 (HB0413)
Title
Baltimore County - Board of Education - Selection of Members
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0273 /CH0154 (HB0225/CH0155)
Title
Veterans Full Employment Act of 2013
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0434 (HB0517)
Title
State Board of Education - Social Impact Bonds - Request for Proposals
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0537 (HB0532)
Title
State Board of Education - Online Courses - Graduation Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0694 (HB0844)
Title
Public School Teachers - Certification - Continuing Education
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0734 (HB1376)
Title
State Board of Education - Mathematics - Graduation Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Currie
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0740 /CH0533 (HB0833)
Title
College and Career Readiness and College Completion Act of 2013
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0775
Title
Education - Model Performance Evaluation Criteria - Implementation
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0822 (HB1245)
Title
Mental Health and Substance Use Disorder Safety Net Act of 2013
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0926 /CH0581
Title
Education - State and Local Aid Program for Certification or Renewal of Certification - Sunset Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0225 /CH0155 (SB0273/CH0154) Veterans Full Employment Act of 2013 Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 155
Health and Government Operations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0413 (SB0010) Baltimore County - Board of Education - Selection of Members Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0517 (SB0434) State Board of Education - Social Impact Bonds - Request for Proposals Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
Appropriations
HB0532 (SB0537) Education - Maryland Advisory Council for Virtual Learning - Responsibilities Delegate Serafini 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0684 Tobacco-Free Schools Act Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0843 State Board of Education - Financial Literacy Curriculum - Graduation Requirement Delegate Walker 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0844 (SB0694) Public School Teachers - Certification - Continuing Education Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0855 Student Health and Fitness Act Delegate Walker 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0875 Education - Public Schools - Parent Empowerment Delegate Bates 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1245 (SB0822) Mental Health and Substance Use Disorder Safety Net Act of 2013 Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1376 (SB0734) State Board of Education - Mathematics - Graduation Requirement Delegate Griffith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/15/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0010 (HB0413) Baltimore County - Board of Education - Selection of Members Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/24/2013 - 1:30 PM
SB0273 /CH0154 (HB0225/CH0155) Veterans Full Employment Act of 2013 President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 154
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/07/2013 - 1:45 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0434 (HB0517) State Board of Education - Social Impact Bonds - Request for Proposals Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0537 (HB0532) State Board of Education - Online Courses - Graduation Requirement Senator Shank 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0694 (HB0844) Public School Teachers - Certification - Continuing Education Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0734 (HB1376) State Board of Education - Mathematics - Graduation Requirement Senator Currie 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0740 /CH0533 (HB0833) College and Career Readiness and College Completion Act of 2013 Senator Pinsky 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 533
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0775 Education - Model Performance Evaluation Criteria - Implementation Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0822 (HB1245) Mental Health and Substance Use Disorder Safety Net Act of 2013 Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0926 /CH0581 Education - State and Local Aid Program for Certification or Renewal of Certification - Sunset Repeal Senator Pinsky 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 581
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM