Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Elder Abuse and Neglect

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0020 (SB0411)
Title
Crimes - Elder Abuse or Neglect - Increased Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0023
Title
Criminal Procedure - Vulnerable Adult Abuse Registry
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0031 (SB0412)
Title
Crimes - Elder Abuse or Neglect - Restrictions on Pretrial Release
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0255
Title
Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture - Property Used in Exploitation of Vulnerable Adults
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0581
Title
Civil Actions - Damages for Crimes Against Vulnerable or Elderly Adults - Standing
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0737 /CH0337 (SB0288/CH0336)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Financial Crimes Against Vulnerable and Elder Adults - Petition to Freeze Assets
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0924 (SB0272)
Title
Requirements for Filial Support - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1222
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Elder Abuse Shelter and Office
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0272 (HB0924)
Title
Requirements for Filial Support - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0288 /CH0336 (HB0737/CH0337)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Financial Crimes Against Vulnerable and Elder Adults - Petition to Freeze Assets
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0411 (HB0020)
Title
Crimes - Elder Abuse or Neglect - Increased Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0412 (HB0031)
Title
Crimes - Elder Abuse or Neglect - Restrictions on Pretrial Release
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0020 (SB0411) Crimes - Elder Abuse or Neglect - Increased Penalties Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
1/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0023 Criminal Procedure - Vulnerable Adult Abuse Registry Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
1/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0031 (SB0412) Crimes - Elder Abuse or Neglect - Restrictions on Pretrial Release Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
1/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0255 Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture - Property Used in Exploitation of Vulnerable Adults Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/20/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0581 Civil Actions - Damages for Crimes Against Vulnerable or Elderly Adults - Standing Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0737 /CH0337 (SB0288/CH0336) Criminal Procedure - Financial Crimes Against Vulnerable and Elder Adults - Petition to Freeze Assets Delegate Wilson, B. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 337
Judiciary
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0924 (SB0272) Requirements for Filial Support - Repeal Delegate Kelly 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1222 Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Elder Abuse Shelter and Office Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/14/2015 - 11:00 AM
SB0272 (HB0924) Requirements for Filial Support - Repeal Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0288 /CH0336 (HB0737/CH0337) Criminal Procedure - Financial Crimes Against Vulnerable and Elder Adults - Petition to Freeze Assets Senator Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 336
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0411 (HB0020) Crimes - Elder Abuse or Neglect - Increased Penalties Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0412 (HB0031) Crimes - Elder Abuse or Neglect - Restrictions on Pretrial Release Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM