Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Elections Supervisors

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0016
Title
Cecil County - Board of Elections - Membership
Sponsor
Delegate Smigiel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0212
Title
Election Law - Statewide Voter Registration List - Removal of Deceased Voters
Sponsor
Delegate Afzali
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0444 (SB0148)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Board of Education - Selection of Members
Sponsor
Delegate Schuh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0559 /CH0345 (SB0818/CH0344)
Title
State Government - Human Trafficking Address Confidentiality Program
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0777
Title
Baltimore County - Board of Education - Selection of Members
Sponsor
Delegate McDonough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0991 /CH0105 (SB0918)
Title
Queen Anne's County and Talbot County - Board of Elections - Membership
Sponsor
Delegate Haddaway-Riccio
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1097 /CH0445
Title
Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales for On-Premises Consumption
Sponsor
Garrett County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1406 /CH0655
Title
Election Law - Signed Voting Authority Cards - Maintenance
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1412
Title
Election Law - Petitions - Advance Determinations
Sponsor
Delegate Bobo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0015 /CH0467
Title
Election Law - Statewide Voter Registration List - Removal of Deceased Voters
Sponsor
Senator Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0148 (HB0444)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Board of Education - Selection of Members
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0243 /CH0047
Title
Cecil County - Board of Elections - Membership
Sponsor
Cecil County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0636
Title
Anne Arundel County Board of Education - Method for Selection of Members (Listen to the People Act of 2014)
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0818 /CH0344 (HB0559/CH0345)
Title
State Government - Human Trafficking Address Confidentiality Program
Sponsor
Senator Forehand
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0848
Title
Election Law - Local Petitions - Advance Determination of Sufficiency of Local Legislation Summary
Sponsor
Senator Kittleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0918 (HB0991/CH0105)
Title
Talbot County - Board of Elections - Membership
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0016 Cecil County - Board of Elections - Membership Delegate Smigiel 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Ways and Means
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0212 Election Law - Statewide Voter Registration List - Removal of Deceased Voters Delegate Afzali 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0444 (SB0148) Anne Arundel County - Board of Education - Selection of Members Delegate Schuh 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0559 /CH0345 (SB0818/CH0344) State Government - Human Trafficking Address Confidentiality Program Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 345
Judiciary
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0777 Baltimore County - Board of Education - Selection of Members Delegate McDonough 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0991 /CH0105 (SB0918) Queen Anne's County and Talbot County - Board of Elections - Membership Delegate Haddaway-Riccio 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 105
Ways and Means
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1097 /CH0445 Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales for On-Premises Consumption Garrett County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 445
Economic Matters
3/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1406 /CH0655 Election Law - Signed Voting Authority Cards - Maintenance Delegate Kipke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 655
Ways and Means
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1412 Election Law - Petitions - Advance Determinations Delegate Bobo 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0015 /CH0467 Election Law - Statewide Voter Registration List - Removal of Deceased Voters Senator Jacobs 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 467
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/23/2014 - 2:45 PM
Ways and Means
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0148 (HB0444) Anne Arundel County - Board of Education - Selection of Members Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/29/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0243 /CH0047 Cecil County - Board of Elections - Membership Cecil County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 47
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0636 Anne Arundel County Board of Education - Method for Selection of Members (Listen to the People Act of 2014) Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0818 /CH0344 (HB0559/CH0345) State Government - Human Trafficking Address Confidentiality Program Senator Forehand 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 344
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0848 Election Law - Local Petitions - Advance Determination of Sufficiency of Local Legislation Summary Senator Kittleman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0918 (HB0991/CH0105) Talbot County - Board of Elections - Membership Senator Colburn 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM