Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Elections, State Board of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0070
Title
Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly Elections
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0212
Title
Election Law - Statewide Voter Registration List - Removal of Deceased Voters
Sponsor
Delegate Afzali
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0418 (SB0691)
Title
Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly Elections
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0483
Title
State Government - Inspector General
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0698
Title
Elections - Study Commission on the Redistricting Process in Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0942
Title
State Government - Use of Public Resources - Reimbursement by Elected State Officials
Sponsor
Delegate McDonough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1094
Title
Election Law - Polling Places - Proof of Identity
Sponsor
Delegate Schuh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1217
Title
Task Force to Study Redistricting in Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Braveboy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1406 /CH0655
Title
Election Law - Signed Voting Authority Cards - Maintenance
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1412
Title
Election Law - Petitions - Advance Determinations
Sponsor
Delegate Bobo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0015 /CH0467
Title
Election Law - Statewide Voter Registration List - Removal of Deceased Voters
Sponsor
Senator Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0438 /CH0501
Title
Municipal Elections - Inclusion of Offices and Questions on the State Ballot
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0691 (HB0418)
Title
Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly Elections
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0848
Title
Election Law - Local Petitions - Advance Determination of Sufficiency of Local Legislation Summary
Sponsor
Senator Kittleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0931
Title
State Board of Elections - Provision of Professional Legal Assistance
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1043
Title
Election Law - Campaign Finance Entities - Inactive Status
Sponsor
Senator Getty
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0070 Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly Elections Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB0212 Election Law - Statewide Voter Registration List - Removal of Deceased Voters Delegate Afzali 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0418 (SB0691) Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly Elections Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 2:15 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/06/2014 - 2:15 PM
HB0483 State Government - Inspector General Delegate Miller, W. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
2/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0698 Elections - Study Commission on the Redistricting Process in Maryland Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0942 State Government - Use of Public Resources - Reimbursement by Elected State Officials Delegate McDonough 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1094 Election Law - Polling Places - Proof of Identity Delegate Schuh 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1217 Task Force to Study Redistricting in Maryland Delegate Braveboy 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1406 /CH0655 Election Law - Signed Voting Authority Cards - Maintenance Delegate Kipke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 655
Ways and Means
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1412 Election Law - Petitions - Advance Determinations Delegate Bobo 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0015 /CH0467 Election Law - Statewide Voter Registration List - Removal of Deceased Voters Senator Jacobs 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 467
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/23/2014 - 2:45 PM
Ways and Means
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0438 /CH0501 Municipal Elections - Inclusion of Offices and Questions on the State Ballot Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 501
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0691 (HB0418) Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly Elections Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0848 Election Law - Local Petitions - Advance Determination of Sufficiency of Local Legislation Summary Senator Kittleman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0931 State Board of Elections - Provision of Professional Legal Assistance Senator Conway 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/02/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1043 Election Law - Campaign Finance Entities - Inactive Status Senator Getty 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM