Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Electronic Commerce -see also- Electronic Funds Transfer

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0316 (SB0374/CH0246)
Title
Consumer Protection - Children's Online Privacy Protection
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0432 (SB0316)
Title
Frederick County - Ethics - Former Officials and Employees
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0437 (SB0753)
Title
Maryland Trust Act
Sponsor
Delegate Simmons
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0497 (SB0852)
Title
Consumer Protection - Sales of Goods and Services - Receipt Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Braveboy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0550 (SB0365)
Title
Income Tax Credit - Web Site Modifications - Accessibility for the Blind
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0590
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Direct Shipment - Kosher or Sacramental Wine Sold at Retail
Sponsor
Delegate Arora
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1127 /CH0303 (SB0634/CH0302)
Title
Commercial Law - Self-Service Storage Facilities
Sponsor
Delegate Jameson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1216 /CH0289 (SB0581/CH0288)
Title
Health Insurance - Federal Mental Health Parity and Addiction Equity Act - Notice and Authorization Forms
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1365 (SB0823)
Title
Pipe Tobacco and Premium Cigars - Direct Sale and Shipment to Consumers
Sponsor
Delegate Howard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1453
Title
Criminal Law - Marijuana - Regulation, Penalties, and Taxation
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1463
Title
Financial Institutions - Check Cashing Services - Disclosure of Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1487
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Online Sales Presumption
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0116
Title
Commercial Law - Cancellation of Sales of Motor Vehicles and Internet Sales
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0272
Title
State Lottery Agency - Tickets - Electronic Devices Connected to the Internet
Sponsor
Senator Currie
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0365 (HB0550)
Title
Income Tax Credit - Web Site Modifications - Accessibility for the Blind
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0374 /CH0246 (HB0316)
Title
Office of the Attorney General - Workgroup on Children's Online Privacy Protection
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0581 /CH0288 (HB1216/CH0289)
Title
Health Insurance - Federal Mental Health Parity and Addiction Equity Act - Notice and Authorization Forms
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0634 /CH0302 (HB1127/CH0303)
Title
Commercial Law - Self-Service Storage Facilities
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0753 (HB0437)
Title
Maryland Trust Act
Sponsor
Senator Stone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0769 /CH0318
Title
Health Benefit Plans - Proposed Rate Increases - Notice to Insureds
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0823 (HB1365)
Title
Pipe Tobacco and Premium Cigars - Direct Sale and Shipment to Consumers
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0852 (HB0497)
Title
Consumer Protection - Sales of Goods and Services - Receipt Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0316 (SB0374/CH0246) Consumer Protection - Children's Online Privacy Protection Delegate Davis 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0432 (SB0316) Frederick County - Ethics - Former Officials and Employees Frederick County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
HB0437 (SB0753) Maryland Trust Act Delegate Simmons 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0497 (SB0852) Consumer Protection - Sales of Goods and Services - Receipt Requirements Delegate Braveboy 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0550 (SB0365) Income Tax Credit - Web Site Modifications - Accessibility for the Blind Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0590 Alcoholic Beverages - Direct Shipment - Kosher or Sacramental Wine Sold at Retail Delegate Arora 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1127 /CH0303 (SB0634/CH0302) Commercial Law - Self-Service Storage Facilities Delegate Jameson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 303
Economic Matters
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1216 /CH0289 (SB0581/CH0288) Health Insurance - Federal Mental Health Parity and Addiction Equity Act - Notice and Authorization Forms Delegate Kelly, A. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 289
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1365 (SB0823) Pipe Tobacco and Premium Cigars - Direct Sale and Shipment to Consumers Delegate Howard 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Economic Matters
Economic Matters
HB1453 Criminal Law - Marijuana - Regulation, Penalties, and Taxation Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1463 Financial Institutions - Check Cashing Services - Disclosure of Fees Delegate Frick 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Economic Matters
Economic Matters
HB1487 Sales and Use Tax - Online Sales Presumption Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0116 Commercial Law - Cancellation of Sales of Motor Vehicles and Internet Sales Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0272 State Lottery Agency - Tickets - Electronic Devices Connected to the Internet Senator Currie 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0365 (HB0550) Income Tax Credit - Web Site Modifications - Accessibility for the Blind Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0374 /CH0246 (HB0316) Office of the Attorney General - Workgroup on Children's Online Privacy Protection Senator Astle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 246
Finance
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0581 /CH0288 (HB1216/CH0289) Health Insurance - Federal Mental Health Parity and Addiction Equity Act - Notice and Authorization Forms Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 288
Finance
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0634 /CH0302 (HB1127/CH0303) Commercial Law - Self-Service Storage Facilities Senator Peters 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 302
Finance
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0753 (HB0437) Maryland Trust Act Senator Stone 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0769 /CH0318 Health Benefit Plans - Proposed Rate Increases - Notice to Insureds Senator Raskin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 318
Finance
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0823 (HB1365) Pipe Tobacco and Premium Cigars - Direct Sale and Shipment to Consumers Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0852 (HB0497) Consumer Protection - Sales of Goods and Services - Receipt Requirements Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM