Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Electronic Commerce -see also- Electronic Funds Transfer

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0071 (SB0514)
Title
Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland Initiative
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0853
Title
Election Law - Campaign Finance Entities - Disbursements by Debit and Credit Cards
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1241
Title
Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Contracts With and Reimbursement of Pharmacists
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0334
Title
Health Insurance - Access to Accurate Provider Directories
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0514 (HB0071)
Title
Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland Initiative
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0976
Title
Commercial Daily Fantasy Sports - Authorization and Regulation
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0071 (SB0514) Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland Initiative Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB0853 Election Law - Campaign Finance Entities - Disbursements by Debit and Credit Cards Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
2/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1241 Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Contracts With and Reimbursement of Pharmacists Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0334 Health Insurance - Access to Accurate Provider Directories Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0514 (HB0071) Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland Initiative Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0976 Commercial Daily Fantasy Sports - Authorization and Regulation Senator Peters 2 2 In the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/07/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM