Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Electronic Commerce -see also- Electronic Funds Transfer

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0047 /CH0199 (SB0090/CH0200)
Title
Electronic Nicotine Delivery Systems Licenses – Modifications
Sponsor
Delegate Jameson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0104 (SB0149/CH0434)
Title
Natural Resources - Electronic Licensing - Voluntary Donations
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0740 /CH0825 (SB0693/CH0826)
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Website Domain Names
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0979 /CH0197
Title
Property and Casualty Insurance - Travel Insurance - Regulation
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1071
Title
Courts - Business and Technology Court
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1604
Title
Business Regulation - Limited Residential Lodging
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1647
Title
Commercial Law - Credit Card Processors - Service Agreements
Sponsor
Delegate Howard, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1654
Title
Commercial Law - Internet Privacy and Net Neutrality
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1759
Title
Vehicle Laws - Personal Motor Vehicle Rentals
Sponsor
Delegate Flanagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0090 /CH0200 (HB0047/CH0199)
Title
Electronic Nicotine Delivery Systems Licenses – Modifications
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0149 /CH0434 (HB0104)
Title
Natural Resources - Electronic Licensing - Voluntary Donations
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0652 /CH0198
Title
Property and Casualty Insurance - Travel Insurance - Regulation
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0693 /CH0826 (HB0740/CH0825)
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Website Domain Names
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0866
Title
Commercial Law - Maryland Uniform Electronic Transactions Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1031
Title
Vehicle Laws – Manufacturers and Dealers – Consumer Data Protection
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1047
Title
Consumer Protection - Scanning or Swiping Identification Cards and Driver's Licenses - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1081
Title
Business Regulation - Limited Residential Lodging
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0047 /CH0199 (SB0090/CH0200) Electronic Nicotine Delivery Systems Licenses – Modifications Delegate Jameson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 199
Economic Matters
1/24/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0104 (SB0149/CH0434) Natural Resources - Electronic Licensing - Voluntary Donations Delegate Robinson 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Environment and Transportation
1/24/2018 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0740 /CH0825 (SB0693/CH0826) Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Website Domain Names Delegate Clippinger 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 825
Economic Matters
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0979 /CH0197 Property and Casualty Insurance - Travel Insurance - Regulation Delegate Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 197
Economic Matters
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1071 Courts - Business and Technology Court Delegate West 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1604 Business Regulation - Limited Residential Lodging Delegate Frick 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/09/2018 - 2:30 PM
HB1647 Commercial Law - Credit Card Processors - Service Agreements Delegate Howard, S. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1654 Commercial Law - Internet Privacy and Net Neutrality Delegate Frick 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Economic Matters
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB1759 Vehicle Laws - Personal Motor Vehicle Rentals Delegate Flanagan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0090 /CH0200 (HB0047/CH0199) Electronic Nicotine Delivery Systems Licenses – Modifications Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 200
Finance
1/17/2018 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
SB0149 /CH0434 (HB0104) Natural Resources - Electronic Licensing - Voluntary Donations Senator Astle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 434
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/25/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0652 /CH0198 Property and Casualty Insurance - Travel Insurance - Regulation Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 198
Finance
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0693 /CH0826 (HB0740/CH0825) Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Website Domain Names Senator Feldman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 826
Finance
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0866 Commercial Law - Maryland Uniform Electronic Transactions Act - Revisions Senator Feldman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1031 Vehicle Laws – Manufacturers and Dealers – Consumer Data Protection Senator Hough 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB1047 Consumer Protection - Scanning or Swiping Identification Cards and Driver's Licenses - Prohibition Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1081 Business Regulation - Limited Residential Lodging Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/04/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM