Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Electronic Surveillance -see also- Wiretapping

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0037
Title
Public Safety - Local Law Enforcement Surveillance Programs and Equipment - Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0058
Title
Baltimore City - Police Tactics and High Crime Zone Notification
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0917 (SB0878)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Cell Site Simulator Technology
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0998
Title
Criminal Procedure - Providing Electronic Device Location Information - Historical Data
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1065
Title
Task Force to Study Law Enforcement Surveillance Technologies
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1163 /CH0643 (SB0976)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Conditional Release - Electronic Monitoring (Amber's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0284
Title
Vehicle-Miles-Traveled Tax and Associated Mandated Devices - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0878 (HB0917)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Cell Site Simulator Technology
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0976 (HB1163/CH0643)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Conditional Release - Electronic Monitoring (Amber's Law)
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0037 Public Safety - Local Law Enforcement Surveillance Programs and Equipment - Reporting Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
1/31/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0058 Baltimore City - Police Tactics and High Crime Zone Notification Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
1/31/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0917 (SB0878) Criminal Procedure - Cell Site Simulator Technology Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0998 Criminal Procedure - Providing Electronic Device Location Information - Historical Data Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1065 Task Force to Study Law Enforcement Surveillance Technologies Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1163 /CH0643 (SB0976) Criminal Procedure - Conditional Release - Electronic Monitoring (Amber's Law) Delegate Miller, A. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 643
Judiciary
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0284 Vehicle-Miles-Traveled Tax and Associated Mandated Devices - Prohibition Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0878 (HB0917) Criminal Procedure - Cell Site Simulator Technology Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0976 (HB1163/CH0643) Criminal Procedure - Conditional Release - Electronic Monitoring (Amber's Law) Senator Lee 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM