Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Engineers

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0347 /CH0613
Title
Professional Engineers - Firm Permits
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0353 /CH0102
Title
Professional Engineers and Professional Land Surveyors - Licensing - Examinations
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0355 /CH0104
Title
State Board of Stationary Engineers - Qualifications for Stationary Engineer's Examination - Grade 1 and Grade 2
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0504 (SB0370/CH0463)
Title
Garrett County - County Commissioners - Industrial Wind Energy Conversion Systems
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0534 (SB0438)
Title
State Procurement - Contracting for Services Outside the United States
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0757 /CH0138
Title
Procurement - Minority Business Enterprises - Reporting of Architectural Services and Engineering Services Contracts
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0305 /CH0224 (HB0296)
Title
Division of Labor and Industry and Associated Boards and Councils - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0370 /CH0463 (HB0504)
Title
Garrett County - County Commissioners - Industrial Wind Energy Conversion Systems
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0438 (HB0534)
Title
State Procurement - Contracting for Services Outside the United States
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0347 /CH0613 Professional Engineers - Firm Permits Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 613
Economic Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0353 /CH0102 Professional Engineers and Professional Land Surveyors - Licensing - Examinations Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 102
Economic Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0355 /CH0104 State Board of Stationary Engineers - Qualifications for Stationary Engineer's Examination - Grade 1 and Grade 2 Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 104
Economic Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0504 (SB0370/CH0463) Garrett County - County Commissioners - Industrial Wind Energy Conversion Systems Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0534 (SB0438) State Procurement - Contracting for Services Outside the United States Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0757 /CH0138 Procurement - Minority Business Enterprises - Reporting of Architectural Services and Engineering Services Contracts Delegate Holmes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 138
Health and Government Operations
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0305 /CH0224 (HB0296) Division of Labor and Industry and Associated Boards and Councils - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation Chair, Finance Committee 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 224
Finance
2/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0370 /CH0463 (HB0504) Garrett County - County Commissioners - Industrial Wind Energy Conversion Systems Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 463
Finance
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0438 (HB0534) State Procurement - Contracting for Services Outside the United States Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM