Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Engineers

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0040 (SB0386)
Title
Courts - Certificate of Merit - Provider of Professional Services
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0379 (SB0324)
Title
Minority Business Enterprise Participation - Liquidated Damages - Architectural or Engineering Services
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0442 (SB0323)
Title
Mechanics' Liens - Design Services
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0455 (SB0387)
Title
Agreements to Defend or Pay the Cost of Defense - Void
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0738 /CH0271
Title
Jurisdiction of the State Ethics Commission and the Maryland State Board of Contract Appeals - Participation in Procurement
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0752 (SB0738)
Title
Professional Engineers - Responsible Charge - Review and Approval of Engineering Documents
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0942 /CH0140 (SB0772)
Title
Apprenticeship Pilot Program - Apprenticeship Maryland
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0109 /CH0012
Title
Task Force to Study Small and Minority Design Firm Participation in State Procurement
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0323 (HB0442)
Title
Mechanics' Liens - Design Services
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0324 (HB0379)
Title
Minority Business Enterprise Participation - Liquidated Damages - Architectural or Engineering Services
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0386 (HB0040)
Title
Courts - Certificate of Merit - Provider of Professional Services
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0387 (HB0455)
Title
Agreements to Defend or Pay the Cost of Defense - Void
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0738 (HB0752)
Title
Professional Engineers - Responsible Charge - Review and Approval of Engineering Documents
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0772 (HB0942/CH0140)
Title
Apprenticeship Pilot Program - Apprenticeship Maryland
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0001
Title
Susquehanna River Basin - Sediment and Nutrient Pollution (National Chesapeake Bay Preservation Act of 2015)
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0040 (SB0386) Courts - Certificate of Merit - Provider of Professional Services Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0379 (SB0324) Minority Business Enterprise Participation - Liquidated Damages - Architectural or Engineering Services Delegate Bromwell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0442 (SB0323) Mechanics' Liens - Design Services Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0455 (SB0387) Agreements to Defend or Pay the Cost of Defense - Void Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0738 /CH0271 Jurisdiction of the State Ethics Commission and the Maryland State Board of Contract Appeals - Participation in Procurement Delegate Krebs 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 271
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0752 (SB0738) Professional Engineers - Responsible Charge - Review and Approval of Engineering Documents Delegate Miller, W. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0942 /CH0140 (SB0772) Apprenticeship Pilot Program - Apprenticeship Maryland Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 140
Economic Matters
3/09/2015 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
Finance
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0109 /CH0012 Task Force to Study Small and Minority Design Firm Participation in State Procurement Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 12
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0323 (HB0442) Mechanics' Liens - Design Services Senator Bates 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0324 (HB0379) Minority Business Enterprise Participation - Liquidated Damages - Architectural or Engineering Services Senator Bates 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0386 (HB0040) Courts - Certificate of Merit - Provider of Professional Services Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0387 (HB0455) Agreements to Defend or Pay the Cost of Defense - Void Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0738 (HB0752) Professional Engineers - Responsible Charge - Review and Approval of Engineering Documents Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0772 (HB0942/CH0140) Apprenticeship Pilot Program - Apprenticeship Maryland President 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/09/2015 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SJ0001 Susquehanna River Basin - Sediment and Nutrient Pollution (National Chesapeake Bay Preservation Act of 2015) Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 3:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/03/2015 - 2:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/30/2015 - 3:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM