Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Engineers

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0452 (SB0429)
Title
Procurement Contracts - Architectural and Engineering Services - Indemnity Clauses
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0534 (SB0519)
Title
Public Schools - State Aid for School Construction - Eligible Costs
Sponsor
Delegate Ghrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0560 /CH0439
Title
Transportation - State Highway Administration - Traffic Calming Devices
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0780
Title
Baltimore City - Speed Limits - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Wells
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0848 (SB0320)
Title
Courts - Documentary Evidence - Protective Order
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0885 /CH0377
Title
Transportation - Vision Zero - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0886
Title
Income Tax - Angel Investor Tax Credit Program
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0991
Title
Courts - Prohibited Indemnity and Defense Liability Agreements
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0993 /CH0554 (SB0710/CH0555)
Title
Anne Arundel County – Ethics – Contributions and Participation in Development Applications
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0998 (SB0655)
Title
Business Occupations and Professions - Professional Engineers - Examination and Continuing Professional Competency Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1113 /CH0510 (SB0640/CH0511)
Title
State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0021
Title
Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - State Occupational Mechanical Licensing Boards' Fund - Elevator Safety Review Board
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0093 /CH0747
Title
Anne Arundel County - Controlled Water Ski Area in Maynadier Creek - Operation of Vessel - Hours of Operation
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0254
Title
Baltimore City Community College - Procurement Authority
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0320 (HB0848)
Title
Courts - Documentary Evidence - Protective Order
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0429 (HB0452)
Title
Procurement Contracts - Architectural and Engineering Services - Indemnity Clauses
Sponsor
Senator Gallion
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0519 (HB0534)
Title
Public Schools - State Aid for School Construction - Eligible Costs
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0640 /CH0511 (HB1113/CH0510)
Title
State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0655 (HB0998)
Title
Business Occupations and Professions - Professional Engineers - Examination and Continuing Professional Competency Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0710 /CH0555 (HB0993/CH0554)
Title
Anne Arundel County – Ethics – Contributions and Participation in Development Applications
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0452 (SB0429) Procurement Contracts - Architectural and Engineering Services - Indemnity Clauses Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0534 (SB0519) Public Schools - State Aid for School Construction - Eligible Costs Delegate Ghrist 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0560 /CH0439 Transportation - State Highway Administration - Traffic Calming Devices Delegate Healey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 439
Environment and Transportation
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB0780 Baltimore City - Speed Limits - Establishment Delegate Wells 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0848 (SB0320) Courts - Documentary Evidence - Protective Order Delegate McComas 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/01/2019 - 11:30 AM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0885 /CH0377 Transportation - Vision Zero - Establishment Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 377
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0886 Income Tax - Angel Investor Tax Credit Program Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0991 Courts - Prohibited Indemnity and Defense Liability Agreements Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB0993 /CH0554 (SB0710/CH0555) Anne Arundel County – Ethics – Contributions and Participation in Development Applications Anne Arundel County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 554
Environment and Transportation
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0998 (SB0655) Business Occupations and Professions - Professional Engineers - Examination and Continuing Professional Competency Requirements Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/01/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1113 /CH0510 (SB0640/CH0511) State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act Delegate Hettleman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 510
Appropriations
3/01/2019 - 1:30 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules
SB0021 Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - State Occupational Mechanical Licensing Boards' Fund - Elevator Safety Review Board Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Failed (22-25)
Finance
1/24/2019 - 2:30 PM
SB0093 /CH0747 Anne Arundel County - Controlled Water Ski Area in Maynadier Creek - Operation of Vessel - Hours of Operation Senator Reilly 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 747
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0254 Baltimore City Community College - Procurement Authority Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0320 (HB0848) Courts - Documentary Evidence - Protective Order Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0429 (HB0452) Procurement Contracts - Architectural and Engineering Services - Indemnity Clauses Senator Gallion 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0519 (HB0534) Public Schools - State Aid for School Construction - Eligible Costs Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0640 /CH0511 (HB1113/CH0510) State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act Senator Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 511
Rules
3/05/2019 - 11:30 AM
Appropriations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0655 (HB0998) Business Occupations and Professions - Professional Engineers - Examination and Continuing Professional Competency Requirements Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0710 /CH0555 (HB0993/CH0554) Anne Arundel County – Ethics – Contributions and Participation in Development Applications Anne Arundel County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 555
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:23 PM