Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Enterprise Zones

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0182 /CH0075
Title
Housing - Community Development Administration - Residential Mortgage Loans
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0419 (SB0709)
Title
Natural Resources - Aquaculture Leases - Consideration of User Conflicts
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0916
Title
Economic Development - Community Revitalization and Improvement Zones
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1047
Title
Enterprise Zone Income Tax Credit - Economically Disadvantaged Individuals - Qualified Ex-Felons
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0507
Title
Maryland Strong Manufacturing Development Act
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0709 (HB0419)
Title
Natural Resources - Aquaculture Leases - Consideration of User Conflicts
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0182 /CH0075 Housing - Community Development Administration - Residential Mortgage Loans Delegate Lafferty 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 75
Environment and Transportation
2/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0419 (SB0709) Natural Resources - Aquaculture Leases - Consideration of User Conflicts Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0916 Economic Development - Community Revitalization and Improvement Zones Delegate Wilson, B. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/13/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1047 Enterprise Zone Income Tax Credit - Economically Disadvantaged Individuals - Qualified Ex-Felons Delegate Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/13/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0507 Maryland Strong Manufacturing Development Act Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Referred to interim study by Budget and Taxation
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0709 (HB0419) Natural Resources - Aquaculture Leases - Consideration of User Conflicts Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM