Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Enterprise Zones

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0278 (SB0415)
Title
Economic Development - Municipal Corporations - Community Revitalization and Improvement Zones
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0450 (SB0386)
Title
Tax Credits - Manufacturing Empowerment Zones
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0531 (SB0181)
Title
Maryland Strong Manufacturing Development Act
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0858
Title
Enterprise Zone Income Tax Credit - Expansion
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1034
Title
Income Tax - Job Creation Tax Credit - Long-Term Unemployed Individuals
Sponsor
Delegate Platt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1255 (SB0843/CH0582)
Title
Tax Credits - Evaluations and Sunset Provisions
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1282
Title
Health Enterprise Zone Practitioners - Trauma-Informed Care - Training
Sponsor
Delegate Sample-Hughes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1533 /CH0604 (SB1062/CH0603)
Title
Baltimore County - Sales and Use Tax Exemption - Redevelopment Areas
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1574 (SB1070)
Title
Certified Business Enterprises - Gaming and Lottery Control Commission Contracts - Preferences
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0076 /CH0156
Title
Enterprise Zones - Reimbursements to Local Governments - Schedule
Sponsor
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0181 (HB0531)
Title
Maryland Strong Manufacturing Development Act
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0386 (HB0450)
Title
Tax Credits - Manufacturing Empowerment Zones
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0415 (HB0278)
Title
Economic Development - Municipal Corporations - Community Revitalization and Improvement Zones
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0560
Title
One Maryland Economic Development Tax Credits - Business Incubators, Enterprise Zones, and Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zones
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0843 /CH0582 (HB1255)
Title
Tax Credits - Evaluations
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1062 /CH0603 (HB1533/CH0604)
Title
Baltimore County - Sales and Use Tax Exemption - Redevelopment Areas
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1070 (HB1574)
Title
Certified Business Enterprises - Gaming and Lottery Control Commission Contracts - Preferences
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0278 (SB0415) Economic Development - Municipal Corporations - Community Revitalization and Improvement Zones Delegate Wilson, B. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0450 (SB0386) Tax Credits - Manufacturing Empowerment Zones Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0531 (SB0181) Maryland Strong Manufacturing Development Act Delegate Beidle 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0858 Enterprise Zone Income Tax Credit - Expansion Delegate Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/04/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1034 Income Tax - Job Creation Tax Credit - Long-Term Unemployed Individuals Delegate Platt 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1255 (SB0843/CH0582) Tax Credits - Evaluations and Sunset Provisions Speaker 6 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1282 Health Enterprise Zone Practitioners - Trauma-Informed Care - Training Delegate Sample-Hughes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB1533 /CH0604 (SB1062/CH0603) Baltimore County - Sales and Use Tax Exemption - Redevelopment Areas Delegate Young, P. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 604
Ways and Means
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2016 - 1:30 PM
HB1574 (SB1070) Certified Business Enterprises - Gaming and Lottery Control Commission Contracts - Preferences Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0076 /CH0156 Enterprise Zones - Reimbursements to Local Governments - Schedule Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 156
Budget and Taxation
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0181 (HB0531) Maryland Strong Manufacturing Development Act Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0386 (HB0450) Tax Credits - Manufacturing Empowerment Zones President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0415 (HB0278) Economic Development - Municipal Corporations - Community Revitalization and Improvement Zones Senator Serafini 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 3:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/02/2016 - 3:00 PM
SB0560 One Maryland Economic Development Tax Credits - Business Incubators, Enterprise Zones, and Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zones Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/07/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0843 /CH0582 (HB1255) Tax Credits - Evaluations President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 582
Budget and Taxation
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1062 /CH0603 (HB1533/CH0604) Baltimore County - Sales and Use Tax Exemption - Redevelopment Areas Senator Guzzone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 603
Budget and Taxation
3/14/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1070 (HB1574) Certified Business Enterprises - Gaming and Lottery Control Commission Contracts - Preferences Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/17/2016 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM