Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Environmental Health -see also- Pollution

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0011 /CH0080
Title
Environment - Bay Restoration Fund - Authorized Uses
Sponsor
Chair, Environmental Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0047
Title
Environment - Mercury - Dental Amalgam
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0166 (SB0449)
Title
State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Effective Date of Adopted Regulations
Sponsor
Delegate Arora
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0189 /CH0549 (SB0711/CH0548)
Title
Maryland Occupational Safety and Health Act - Chemical Information List - Submission, Maintenance, and Accessibility
Sponsor
Delegate Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0628 /CH0285 (SB0238/CH0284)
Title
Board of Public Works - Relocatable Classrooms - Indoor Air Quality Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0880 (SB0658)
Title
Marijuana Control Act of 2014
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1191 (SB0778)
Title
Health - General - Genetically Engineered Food - Labeling Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1210 (SB0706)
Title
Environment - Permit Determinations - Cumulative Impact Assessments
Sponsor
Delegate Swain
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1258 /CH0649
Title
Health Occupations - Maryland Environmental Health Specialists Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Pendergrass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1291
Title
Clean Indoor Air Act - Use of Electronic Smoking Devices - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1430 /CH0656
Title
Health - State Children's Environmental Health and Protection Advisory Council - Composition
Sponsor
Delegate Hubbard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1539 (SB1096)
Title
Maryland Port Administration - Chesapeake and Delaware Canal - Dredged Material Containment Areas - Remediation Plan
Sponsor
Delegate Smigiel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0238 /CH0284 (HB0628/CH0285)
Title
Board of Public Works - Relocatable Classrooms - Indoor Air Quality Requirements
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0394
Title
Statewide Container Recycling Refund Program
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0449 (HB0166)
Title
State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Effective Date of Adopted Regulations
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0535
Title
Natural Gas Severance Tax and Impact Account
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0631
Title
Environment - Retail Service Stations - Setback Certification
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0658 (HB0880)
Title
The Marijuana Taxation and Regulation Act
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0706 (HB1210)
Title
Environment - Permit Determinations - Cumulative Impact Assessments
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0711 /CH0548 (HB0189/CH0549)
Title
Maryland Occupational Safety and Health Act - Chemical Information List - Submission, Maintenance, and Accessibility
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0778 (HB1191)
Title
Health - General - Genetically Engineered Food - Labeling Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Montgomery
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1096 (HB1539)
Title
Maryland Port Administration - Chesapeake and Delaware Canal - Dredged Material Containment Areas - Remediation Plan
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0011 /CH0080 Environment - Bay Restoration Fund - Authorized Uses Chair, Environmental Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 80
Environmental Matters
1/29/2014 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0047 Environment - Mercury - Dental Amalgam Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
HB0166 (SB0449) State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Effective Date of Adopted Regulations Delegate Arora 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
1/29/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0189 /CH0549 (SB0711/CH0548) Maryland Occupational Safety and Health Act - Chemical Information List - Submission, Maintenance, and Accessibility Delegate Serafini 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 549
Economic Matters
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0628 /CH0285 (SB0238/CH0284) Board of Public Works - Relocatable Classrooms - Indoor Air Quality Requirements Delegate Robinson, S. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 285
Health and Government Operations
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2014 - 1:45 PM
HB0880 (SB0658) Marijuana Control Act of 2014 Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1191 (SB0778) Health - General - Genetically Engineered Food - Labeling Requirements Delegate Kelly 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1210 (SB0706) Environment - Permit Determinations - Cumulative Impact Assessments Delegate Swain 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1258 /CH0649 Health Occupations - Maryland Environmental Health Specialists Act - Revisions Delegate Pendergrass 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 649
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1291 Clean Indoor Air Act - Use of Electronic Smoking Devices - Prohibition Delegate Miller, A. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1430 /CH0656 Health - State Children's Environmental Health and Protection Advisory Council - Composition Delegate Hubbard 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 656
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1539 (SB1096) Maryland Port Administration - Chesapeake and Delaware Canal - Dredged Material Containment Areas - Remediation Plan Delegate Smigiel 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0238 /CH0284 (HB0628/CH0285) Board of Public Works - Relocatable Classrooms - Indoor Air Quality Requirements Senator King 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 284
Budget and Taxation
1/29/2014 - 1:45 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0394 Statewide Container Recycling Refund Program Senator Frosh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0449 (HB0166) State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Effective Date of Adopted Regulations Senator Young 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2014 - 1:45 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0535 Natural Gas Severance Tax and Impact Account Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0631 Environment - Retail Service Stations - Setback Certification Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0658 (HB0880) The Marijuana Taxation and Regulation Act Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0706 (HB1210) Environment - Permit Determinations - Cumulative Impact Assessments Senator Benson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/02/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0711 /CH0548 (HB0189/CH0549) Maryland Occupational Safety and Health Act - Chemical Information List - Submission, Maintenance, and Accessibility Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 548
Finance
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0778 (HB1191) Health - General - Genetically Engineered Food - Labeling Requirements Senator Montgomery 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1096 (HB1539) Maryland Port Administration - Chesapeake and Delaware Canal - Dredged Material Containment Areas - Remediation Plan Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM