Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Environmental Health -see also- Pollution

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0007
Title
Environment - Lead Hazards - Environmental Investigation, Reporting, and Risk Reduction
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0354 (SB0624)
Title
Clean Indoor Air Act - Use of Electronic Cigarette Devices - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0414 (SB0355/CH0388)
Title
Gas Companies - Rate Regulation - Environmental Remediation Costs
Sponsor
Delegate Barkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0597
Title
Public Health - Clean Indoor Air Act - Repeal of Exception Regarding Hotel and Motel Rooms
Sponsor
Delegate Platt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1290
Title
State Government - Management of Public Buildings - Indoor Air Quality
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1330
Title
Large Family Child Care Homes and Child Care Centers - Green Product Cleaning Supplies - Regulations
Sponsor
Delegate Angel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1414 /CH0393 (SB1146)
Title
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Study
Sponsor
Delegate Jameson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0355 /CH0388 (HB0414)
Title
Gas Companies - Rate Regulation - Environmental Remediation Costs
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0537
Title
Public Health - School Buildings - Minimum Health Standards (Healthy Schools Program)
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0624 (HB0354)
Title
Clean Indoor Air Act - Use of Electronic Cigarette Devices - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0715 (HB0773/CH0382)
Title
Clean Energy - Energy Storage Technology Study
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0773
Title
Community Healthy Air Act
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1146 (HB1414/CH0393)
Title
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Study
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0007 Environment - Lead Hazards - Environmental Investigation, Reporting, and Risk Reduction Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0354 (SB0624) Clean Indoor Air Act - Use of Electronic Cigarette Devices - Prohibition Delegate Miller, A. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0414 (SB0355/CH0388) Gas Companies - Rate Regulation - Environmental Remediation Costs Delegate Barkley 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Finance
Economic Matters
2/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0597 Public Health - Clean Indoor Air Act - Repeal of Exception Regarding Hotel and Motel Rooms Delegate Platt 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1290 State Government - Management of Public Buildings - Indoor Air Quality Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1330 Large Family Child Care Homes and Child Care Centers - Green Product Cleaning Supplies - Regulations Delegate Angel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1414 /CH0393 (SB1146) Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Study Delegate Jameson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 393
Economic Matters
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0355 /CH0388 (HB0414) Gas Companies - Rate Regulation - Environmental Remediation Costs Senator Serafini 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 388
Finance
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0537 Public Health - School Buildings - Minimum Health Standards (Healthy Schools Program) Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0624 (HB0354) Clean Indoor Air Act - Use of Electronic Cigarette Devices - Prohibition Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0715 (HB0773/CH0382) Clean Energy - Energy Storage Technology Study Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0773 Community Healthy Air Act Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1146 (HB1414/CH0393) Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Study Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM