Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Environmental Health -see also- Pollution

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0057
Title
Large Family Child Care Homes and Child Care Centers - Green Product Cleaning Supplies - Regulations
Sponsor
Delegate Angel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0183 /CH0779
Title
Prince George's County Environmental Justice Commission PG 411-18
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0233
Title
Task Force to Study Health and Safety Standards for Rental Housing in Prince George's County PG 410-18
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0850
Title
Solid Waste Management and Recycling – Mattresses and Box Springs
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0939
Title
Regional Carbon Cost Collection Initiative
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0947 (SB0958)
Title
Natural Resources - Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Purpose and Authorized Use of Funds
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1055
Title
State Finance and Procurement - Chesapeake Bay Watershed States - Expenses and Contracts (Quit Polluting My Bay Act of 2018)
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1212
Title
Public Health - Sale or Distribution of Trichloroethylene - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1217 /CH0235 (SB0924/CH0234)
Title
Local Government – Splash Pads – Regulations
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1249
Title
Crab Harvest – Start Time – Days in July
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0138 (HB0003/CH0627)
Title
Environment - U.S. Climate Alliance - Membership
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0873
Title
Constitutional Amendment - Right to Healthy Environment and Communities
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0924 /CH0234 (HB1217/CH0235)
Title
Local Government – Splash Pads – Regulations
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0958 (HB0947)
Title
Natural Resources - Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Purpose and Authorized Use of Funds
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0057 Large Family Child Care Homes and Child Care Centers - Green Product Cleaning Supplies - Regulations Delegate Angel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
1/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0183 /CH0779 Prince George's County Environmental Justice Commission PG 411-18 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 779
Environment and Transportation
3/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/09/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0233 Task Force to Study Health and Safety Standards for Rental Housing in Prince George's County PG 410-18 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB0850 Solid Waste Management and Recycling – Mattresses and Box Springs Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB0939 Regional Carbon Cost Collection Initiative Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/05/2018 - 2:00 PM
HB0947 (SB0958) Natural Resources - Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Purpose and Authorized Use of Funds Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1055 State Finance and Procurement - Chesapeake Bay Watershed States - Expenses and Contracts (Quit Polluting My Bay Act of 2018) Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1212 Public Health - Sale or Distribution of Trichloroethylene - Prohibition Delegate Lam 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1217 /CH0235 (SB0924/CH0234) Local Government – Splash Pads – Regulations Delegate Lierman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 235
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1249 Crab Harvest – Start Time – Days in July Delegate Adams 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0138 (HB0003/CH0627) Environment - U.S. Climate Alliance - Membership Senator Conway 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/25/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0873 Constitutional Amendment - Right to Healthy Environment and Communities Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0924 /CH0234 (HB1217/CH0235) Local Government – Splash Pads – Regulations Senator Ferguson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 234
Finance
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0958 (HB0947) Natural Resources - Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Purpose and Authorized Use of Funds Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM