Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Environmental Service, Maryland

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0239 (SB0291/CH0015)
Title
Maryland Environmental Service - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0830 /CH0755 (SB0386)
Title
Pollinator Habitat Plans - Plan Contents - Requirements and Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0291 /CH0015 (HB0239)
Title
Maryland Environmental Service - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0386 (HB0830/CH0755)
Title
Pollinator Habitat Plans - Plan Contents - Requirements and Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0239 (SB0291/CH0015) Maryland Environmental Service - Collective Bargaining Delegate Young, P. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0830 /CH0755 (SB0386) Pollinator Habitat Plans - Plan Contents - Requirements and Prohibition Delegate Healey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 755
Environment and Transportation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0291 /CH0015 (HB0239) Maryland Environmental Service - Collective Bargaining Senator Rosapepe 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 15
Finance
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0386 (HB0830/CH0755) Pollinator Habitat Plans - Plan Contents - Requirements and Prohibition Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 Veto sustained (0-44)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM