Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Environmental Trust

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0276 /CH0352 (SB0137/CH0351)
Title
Income Tax Credit - Preservation and Conservation Easements
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0004 /CH0148
Title
Natural Resources - Maryland Environmental Trust - Trustees
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0137 /CH0351 (HB0276/CH0352)
Title
Income Tax Credit - Preservation and Conservation Easements
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0276 /CH0352 (SB0137/CH0351) Income Tax Credit - Preservation and Conservation Easements Delegate Stein 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 352
Ways and Means
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0004 /CH0148 Natural Resources - Maryland Environmental Trust - Trustees Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 148
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/19/2016 - 2:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0137 /CH0351 (HB0276/CH0352) Income Tax Credit - Preservation and Conservation Easements Senator Eckardt 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 351
Budget and Taxation
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM