Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Escrow Accounts

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0109 /CH0400
Title
Guardianship of the Person - Disabled Persons - Attorney's Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0321 (SB0159)
Title
Funeral Establishments - Pre-Need Contracts - Reporting and Audit Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0343
Title
Real Property - Construction Contracts - Retention Proceeds - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Impallaria
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0892 (SB0329)
Title
Baltimore County - Civil Actions - Subpoena for Police Officer - Liability of Party for Reimbursement of Cost
Sponsor
Baltimore County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0159 (HB0321)
Title
Funeral Establishments - Pre-Need Contracts - Reporting and Audit Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Montgomery
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0329 (HB0892)
Title
Baltimore County - Civil Actions - Subpoena for Police Officer - Liability of Party for Reimbursement of Cost
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0109 /CH0400 Guardianship of the Person - Disabled Persons - Attorney's Fees Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 400
Health and Government Operations
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0321 (SB0159) Funeral Establishments - Pre-Need Contracts - Reporting and Audit Requirements Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0343 Real Property - Construction Contracts - Retention Proceeds - Repeal Delegate Impallaria 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0892 (SB0329) Baltimore County - Civil Actions - Subpoena for Police Officer - Liability of Party for Reimbursement of Cost Baltimore County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0159 (HB0321) Funeral Establishments - Pre-Need Contracts - Reporting and Audit Requirements Senator Montgomery 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0329 (HB0892) Baltimore County - Civil Actions - Subpoena for Police Officer - Liability of Party for Reimbursement of Cost Senator Klausmeier 4 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM