Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Escrow Accounts

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0222 /CH0349
Title
Real Property - Residential Real Estate Transactions - Escrow Agents
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0396 /CH0647
Title
Property Tax - Optional Installment Payment Schedule
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1159
Title
Cigarette Restitution Fund - Establishment of Account
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1209 /CH0730
Title
Property Tax - Collection of Unpaid Taxes and Tax Sales
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0222 /CH0349 Real Property - Residential Real Estate Transactions - Escrow Agents Delegate Holmes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 349
Environment and Transportation
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB0396 /CH0647 Property Tax - Optional Installment Payment Schedule Delegate Carr 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 647
Ways and Means
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1159 Cigarette Restitution Fund - Establishment of Account Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1209 /CH0730 Property Tax - Collection of Unpaid Taxes and Tax Sales Delegate Kaiser 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 730
Ways and Means
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:23 PM