Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Estate Tax

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0099 /CH0435 (SB0192)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0946
Title
Maryland Estate Tax - Unified Credit
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0359
Title
Maryland Estate Tax - Unified Credit
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0398 /CH0197
Title
Code Revision - Estates and Trusts
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0099 /CH0435 (SB0192) Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 435
Health and Government Operations
2/05/2019 - 2:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0946 Maryland Estate Tax - Unified Credit Delegate Adams 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
SB0359 Maryland Estate Tax - Unified Credit Senator Serafini 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0398 /CH0197 Code Revision - Estates and Trusts President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 197
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2019 - 12:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:23 PM