Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Eviction

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0249 /CH0489 (SB0345/CH0488)
Title
Real Property - Residential Leases - Interest on Security Deposits
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0422 (SB0991)
Title
Dogs - Discrimination Based on Breed, Type, or Heritage - Prohibited
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0645
Title
Real Property - Landlord Defenses in Nuisance Actions
Sponsor
Delegate Weir
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0843
Title
Residential Leases - Just Cause Evictions
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0946 (SB0181)
Title
Residential Leases - Just-Cause Eviction
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1077
Title
Real Property - Landlord and Tenant - Service of Process
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1328 (SB0865/CH0567)
Title
Maryland Cooperative Housing Act - Transparency Requirements and Member Rights
Sponsor
Delegate Swain
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1529 (SB1095)
Title
Real Property - Ground Rents
Sponsor
Delegate McIntosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0174
Title
Real Property - Right to Redemption of Leased Premises - Forms of Payment
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0181 (HB0946)
Title
Residential Leases - Just-Cause Eviction
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0345 /CH0488 (HB0249/CH0489)
Title
Real Property - Residential Leases - Interest on Security Deposits
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0800 /CH0556 (HB1108)
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Retaliatory Actions - Conditions for Relief
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0865 /CH0567 (HB1328)
Title
Maryland Cooperative Housing Act - Transparency Requirements and Member Rights
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0904
Title
Residential Leases - Rental Fees - Landlord and Tenant Relations (Maryland Rental Housing Stabilization Act)
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0991 (HB0422)
Title
Dogs - Discrimination Based on Breed, Type, or Heritage - Prohibited
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1095 (HB1529)
Title
Real Property - Ground Rents
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0249 /CH0489 (SB0345/CH0488) Real Property - Residential Leases - Interest on Security Deposits Delegate McMillan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 489
Environmental Matters
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0422 (SB0991) Dogs - Discrimination Based on Breed, Type, or Heritage - Prohibited Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0645 Real Property - Landlord Defenses in Nuisance Actions Delegate Weir 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0843 Residential Leases - Just Cause Evictions Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0946 (SB0181) Residential Leases - Just-Cause Eviction Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1077 Real Property - Landlord and Tenant - Service of Process Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1328 (SB0865/CH0567) Maryland Cooperative Housing Act - Transparency Requirements and Member Rights Delegate Swain 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Environmental Matters
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1529 (SB1095) Real Property - Ground Rents Delegate McIntosh 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0174 Real Property - Right to Redemption of Leased Premises - Forms of Payment Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0181 (HB0946) Residential Leases - Just-Cause Eviction Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0345 /CH0488 (HB0249/CH0489) Real Property - Residential Leases - Interest on Security Deposits Senator Muse 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 488
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0800 /CH0556 (HB1108) Landlord and Tenant - Retaliatory Actions - Conditions for Relief Senator Ramirez 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 556
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0865 /CH0567 (HB1328) Maryland Cooperative Housing Act - Transparency Requirements and Member Rights Senator Benson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 567
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0904 Residential Leases - Rental Fees - Landlord and Tenant Relations (Maryland Rental Housing Stabilization Act) Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0991 (HB0422) Dogs - Discrimination Based on Breed, Type, or Heritage - Prohibited Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB1095 (HB1529) Real Property - Ground Rents Senator Frosh 2 2 In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM