Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Excise Tax

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0176
Title
Transportation Trust Fund Protection Act
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0412 (SB0451)
Title
Vessel Excise Tax - Exemption for Commercial Enterprises Paying the Admissions and Amusement Tax
Sponsor
Delegate George
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0524 (SB0643)
Title
Transportation Trust Fund - Use of Funds
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0548 (SB0090/CH0180)
Title
Natural Resources - Vessel Excise Tax - Maximum Tax
Sponsor
Delegate George
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0721 (SB0485)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Excise Tax Exemptions - Leased Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0791 /CH0389 (SB0728)
Title
Tax Credits - Electric Vehicles - Extensions
Sponsor
Delegate McHale
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0836 /CH0065 (SB0600/CH0064)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Electric Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0999
Title
Worcester County - Alcoholic Beverages
Sponsor
Worcester County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1046
Title
Transportation Trust Fund - Dedicated Highway Funds
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1302
Title
Commission on Tax Policy, Reform, and Fairness
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1453
Title
Criminal Law - Marijuana - Regulation, Penalties, and Taxation
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1515 /CH0429 (SB1054)
Title
Transportation Infrastructure Investment Act of 2013
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0090 /CH0180 (HB0548)
Title
Natural Resources - Vessel Excise Tax - Waterway Improvement Fund
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0253
Title
Transportation Trust Fund - Dedicated Highway Funds
Sponsor
Senator Brinkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0451 (HB0412)
Title
Vessel Excise Tax - Exemption for Commercial Enterprises Paying the Admissions and Amusement Tax
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0485 (HB0721)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Excise Tax Exemptions - Leased Vehicles
Sponsor
Senator McFadden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0600 /CH0064 (HB0836/CH0065)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Electric Vehicles
Sponsor
Senator Garagiola
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0636
Title
Motor Vehicle Excise Tax - Leased Vehicles - Application of Trade-In Value
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0643 (HB0524)
Title
End the Gridlock
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0728 (HB0791/CH0389)
Title
Tax Credits - Electric Vehicles - Extensions
Sponsor
Senator DeGrange
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0829 /CH0422
Title
Transportation Trust Fund - Use of Funds
Sponsor
Senator Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1054 (HB1515/CH0429)
Title
Transportation Infrastructure Investment Act of 2013
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0176 Transportation Trust Fund Protection Act Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB0412 (SB0451) Vessel Excise Tax - Exemption for Commercial Enterprises Paying the Admissions and Amusement Tax Delegate George 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0524 (SB0643) Transportation Trust Fund - Use of Funds Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
Rules
HB0548 (SB0090/CH0180) Natural Resources - Vessel Excise Tax - Maximum Tax Delegate George 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0721 (SB0485) Vehicle Laws - Excise Tax Exemptions - Leased Vehicles Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB0791 /CH0389 (SB0728) Tax Credits - Electric Vehicles - Extensions Delegate McHale 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 389
Ways and Means
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0836 /CH0065 (SB0600/CH0064) Vehicle Laws - Electric Vehicles Delegate Malone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 65
Environmental Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0999 Worcester County - Alcoholic Beverages Worcester County Delegation 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1046 Transportation Trust Fund - Dedicated Highway Funds Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1302 Commission on Tax Policy, Reform, and Fairness Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/08/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1453 Criminal Law - Marijuana - Regulation, Penalties, and Taxation Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1515 /CH0429 (SB1054) Transportation Infrastructure Investment Act of 2013 Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 429
Ways and Means
3/15/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0090 /CH0180 (HB0548) Natural Resources - Vessel Excise Tax - Waterway Improvement Fund Senator Astle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 180
Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0253 Transportation Trust Fund - Dedicated Highway Funds Senator Brinkley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0451 (HB0412) Vessel Excise Tax - Exemption for Commercial Enterprises Paying the Admissions and Amusement Tax Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0485 (HB0721) Vehicle Laws - Excise Tax Exemptions - Leased Vehicles Senator McFadden 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 PM
SB0600 /CH0064 (HB0836/CH0065) Vehicle Laws - Electric Vehicles Senator Garagiola 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 64
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/29/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0636 Motor Vehicle Excise Tax - Leased Vehicles - Application of Trade-In Value Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 PM
SB0643 (HB0524) End the Gridlock Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 PM
SB0728 (HB0791/CH0389) Tax Credits - Electric Vehicles - Extensions Senator DeGrange 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 PM
SB0829 /CH0422 Transportation Trust Fund - Use of Funds Senator Miller 2 2 Assigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 422
Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 PM
Appropriations
Ways and Means
SB1054 (HB1515/CH0429) Transportation Infrastructure Investment Act of 2013 President 3 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM