Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Excise Tax

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0104
Title
Montgomery County - Transit Authority MC 24-15
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0122
Title
Task Force to Study the Impact of State and Local Taxes on Small Businesses
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0135 /CH0491
Title
Charles County - School Construction Excise Tax Rates
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0221 (SB0073)
Title
Commission on Tax Policy, Reform, and Fairness
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0313 /CH0157 (SB0298/CH0156)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Dealers - Financing or Leasing Agreements
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0827 /CH0282
Title
Alcoholic Beverage Taxes - Wine Tax Revenue Distribution
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0911 (SB0531)
Title
Marijuana Control and Revenue Act of 2015
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0073 (HB0221)
Title
Commission on Tax Policy, Reform, and Fairness
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0298 /CH0156 (HB0313/CH0157)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Dealers - Financing or Leasing Agreements
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0531 (HB0911)
Title
Marijuana Control and Revenue Act of 2015
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0707 /CH0049
Title
Alcoholic Beverage Tax Returns - Manufacturers and Wholesalers - Due Date
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0104 Montgomery County - Transit Authority MC 24-15 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
Ways and Means
HB0122 Task Force to Study the Impact of State and Local Taxes on Small Businesses Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0135 /CH0491 Charles County - School Construction Excise Tax Rates Charles County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 491
Ways and Means
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0221 (SB0073) Commission on Tax Policy, Reform, and Fairness Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0313 /CH0157 (SB0298/CH0156) Vehicle Laws - Dealers - Financing or Leasing Agreements Delegate Beidle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 157
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0827 /CH0282 Alcoholic Beverage Taxes - Wine Tax Revenue Distribution Delegate Hixson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 282
Ways and Means
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0911 (SB0531) Marijuana Control and Revenue Act of 2015 Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0073 (HB0221) Commission on Tax Policy, Reform, and Fairness Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Budget and Taxation
2/04/2015 - 2:00 PM
SB0298 /CH0156 (HB0313/CH0157) Vehicle Laws - Dealers - Financing or Leasing Agreements Senator Norman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 156
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/08/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0531 (HB0911) Marijuana Control and Revenue Act of 2015 Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0707 /CH0049 Alcoholic Beverage Tax Returns - Manufacturers and Wholesalers - Due Date Senator Eckardt 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 49
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM