Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Excise Tax

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0372 /CH0352 (SB0277/CH0351)
Title
Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1065 /CH0512 (SB0768)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Title Service Agents
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1091 (SB1030)
Title
Off-Highway Recreational Vehicle Fund - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Folden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0177
Title
Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment Rebate Program and Electric Vehicle Excise Tax Credit - Fiscal Year 2017 Applicants
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0277 /CH0351 (HB0372/CH0352)
Title
Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0606 /CH0700
Title
Off-Highway Recreational Vehicles - Excise Titling Tax - Off-Highway Recreational Vehicle Trail Fund
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0768 (HB1065/CH0512)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Title Service Agents
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0372 /CH0352 (SB0277/CH0351) Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act Delegate Korman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 352
Appropriations
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1065 /CH0512 (SB0768) Vehicle Laws - Title Service Agents Delegate McMillan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 512
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1091 (SB1030) Off-Highway Recreational Vehicle Fund - Establishment Delegate Folden 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/09/2018 - 2:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0177 Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment Rebate Program and Electric Vehicle Excise Tax Credit - Fiscal Year 2017 Applicants Senator Manno 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Budget and Taxation
1/30/2018 - 1:30 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0277 /CH0351 (HB0372/CH0352) Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 351
Budget and Taxation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/05/2018 - 2:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0606 /CH0700 Off-Highway Recreational Vehicles - Excise Titling Tax - Off-Highway Recreational Vehicle Trail Fund Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 700
Budget and Taxation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0768 (HB1065/CH0512) Vehicle Laws - Title Service Agents Senator Ready 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM
Click to return on the top page