Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Ex-Offenders

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0068 (SB0444)
Title
Family Law - Denial of Custody or Visitation - Sexual Abuse of a Minor
Sponsor
Delegate Haddaway-Riccio
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0236 (SB0208)
Title
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0309 /CH0114 (SB0334/CH0113)
Title
Family Law - Domestic Violence - Permanent Final Protective Orders
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0379
Title
Criminal Procedure - Vulnerable Adult Abuse Registry
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0642 (SB0608/CH0182)
Title
Correctional Services - Swift and Certain Sanctions Pilot Program - Expansion
Sponsor
Delegate Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0656 (SB0321/CH0291)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Personal Representatives and Guardians - Standards
Sponsor
Delegate Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0796 (SB0669/CH0189)
Title
Procurement - Debarment - Violations of Law
Sponsor
Delegate Turner, V.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0841
Title
State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists and State Board of Social Work Examiners - Grounds for Denying Licenses and Certificates
Sponsor
Delegate Smigiel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0921 (SB0398/CH0162)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Certificate of Completion
Sponsor
Delegate Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0993
Title
Registered Sex Offenders - Prohibition - Halloween Activities
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1072
Title
Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Facilities - Sex Offenders
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1160 (SB0919)
Title
Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1324
Title
Maryland Youth Employment Act of 2014
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1511
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Adult Dependent Care Providers - Maryland Background Check Program
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0208 (HB0236)
Title
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0321 /CH0291 (HB0656)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Personal Representatives and Guardians - Standards
Sponsor
Senator Getty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0334 /CH0113 (HB0309/CH0114)
Title
Family Law - Domestic Violence - Permanent Final Protective Orders
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0398 /CH0162 (HB0921)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Certificate of Completion
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0444 (HB0068)
Title
Family Law - Denial of Custody or Visitation - Sexual Abuse of a Minor
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0608 /CH0182 (HB0642)
Title
Correctional Services - Swift and Certain Sanctions Pilot Program - Expansion
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0669 /CH0189 (HB0796)
Title
Procurement - Debarment - Violations of Law
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0838
Title
Private Process Servers - Licensing
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0919 (HB1160)
Title
Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0068 (SB0444) Family Law - Denial of Custody or Visitation - Sexual Abuse of a Minor Delegate Haddaway-Riccio 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/16/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0236 (SB0208) Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0309 /CH0114 (SB0334/CH0113) Family Law - Domestic Violence - Permanent Final Protective Orders Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 114
Judiciary
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0379 Criminal Procedure - Vulnerable Adult Abuse Registry Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0642 (SB0608/CH0182) Correctional Services - Swift and Certain Sanctions Pilot Program - Expansion Delegate Hough 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0656 (SB0321/CH0291) Estates and Trusts - Personal Representatives and Guardians - Standards Delegate Ready 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0796 (SB0669/CH0189) Procurement - Debarment - Violations of Law Delegate Turner, V. 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Health and Government Operations
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0841 State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists and State Board of Social Work Examiners - Grounds for Denying Licenses and Certificates Delegate Smigiel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2014 - 12:30 PM
HB0921 (SB0398/CH0162) Criminal Procedure - Certificate of Completion Delegate Hough 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0993 Registered Sex Offenders - Prohibition - Halloween Activities Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1072 Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Facilities - Sex Offenders Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1160 (SB0919) Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services - Establishment Delegate Barnes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1324 Maryland Youth Employment Act of 2014 Delegate Washington, A. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1511 Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Adult Dependent Care Providers - Maryland Background Check Program Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2014 - 12:30 PM
SB0208 (HB0236) Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act Senator Kelley 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0321 /CH0291 (HB0656) Estates and Trusts - Personal Representatives and Guardians - Standards Senator Getty 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 291
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0334 /CH0113 (HB0309/CH0114) Family Law - Domestic Violence - Permanent Final Protective Orders President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 113
Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0398 /CH0162 (HB0921) Criminal Procedure - Certificate of Completion Senator Shank 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 162
Judicial Proceedings
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0444 (HB0068) Family Law - Denial of Custody or Visitation - Sexual Abuse of a Minor Senator Colburn 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0608 /CH0182 (HB0642) Correctional Services - Swift and Certain Sanctions Pilot Program - Expansion Senator Shank 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 182
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0669 /CH0189 (HB0796) Procurement - Debarment - Violations of Law Senator Ramirez 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 189
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0838 Private Process Servers - Licensing Senator Frosh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0919 (HB1160) Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services - Establishment Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM