Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Ex-Offenders

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0440 (SB0055)
Title
Employers of Ex-Offenders - Liability for Negligent Hiring or Inadequate Supervision - Immunity
Sponsor
Delegate Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0694 /CH0002 (SB0543)
Title
Higher Education - Admissions Process - Criminal History (Maryland Fair Access to Education Act of 2017)
Sponsor
Delegate McIntosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0847
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Benefits for Individuals Who Are Incarcerated or Institutionalized
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0860 /CH0793 (SB0853/CH0792)
Title
Transitional Supports for Ex-Offenders - Repeal of Restrictions (Maryland Equal Access to Food Act of 2017)
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1381 /CH0608 (SB0866/CH0609)
Title
Adult High School Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1443 (SB0999)
Title
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission Reform Act
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1465
Title
Baltimore City - Police Community Policing Steering Committee
Sponsor
Delegate Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1552 (SB0766)
Title
Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services - Operators' Licenses and Vehicle Permits
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0055 (HB0440)
Title
Employers of Ex-Offenders - Liability for Negligent Hiring or Inadequate Supervision - Immunity
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0408
Title
Senior Apartment Facilities - Limitation on Occupancy by Person Convicted of Crime of Violence
Sponsor
Senator Robinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0543 (HB0694/CH0002)
Title
Higher Education - Admissions Process - Criminal History (Maryland Fair Access to Education Act of 2017)
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0561
Title
Public Safety - Criminal Injuries Compensation Board - Ineligibility
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0766 (HB1552)
Title
Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services - Operators' Licenses and Vehicle Permits
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0853 /CH0792 (HB0860/CH0793)
Title
Transitional Supports for Ex-Offenders - Repeal of Restrictions (Maryland Equal Access to Food Act of 2017)
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0866 /CH0609 (HB1381/CH0608)
Title
Adult High School Pilot Program
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0922
Title
Business Regulation - State Junk Licenses and Trader's Licenses - Applicants
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0440 (SB0055) Employers of Ex-Offenders - Liability for Negligent Hiring or Inadequate Supervision - Immunity Delegate Cassilly 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0694 /CH0002 (SB0543) Higher Education - Admissions Process - Criminal History (Maryland Fair Access to Education Act of 2017) Delegate McIntosh 2 2 Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 2 of 2018
Appropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0847 Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Benefits for Individuals Who Are Incarcerated or Institutionalized Delegate Queen 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0860 /CH0793 (SB0853/CH0792) Transitional Supports for Ex-Offenders - Repeal of Restrictions (Maryland Equal Access to Food Act of 2017) Delegate Lierman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 793
Appropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1381 /CH0608 (SB0866/CH0609) Adult High School Pilot Program Delegate Clippinger 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 608
Economic Matters
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1443 (SB0999) Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission Reform Act Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - House Concur - Senate Amendments
Health and Government Operations
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1465 Baltimore City - Police Community Policing Steering Committee Delegate Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1552 (SB0766) Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services - Operators' Licenses and Vehicle Permits Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0055 (HB0440) Employers of Ex-Offenders - Liability for Negligent Hiring or Inadequate Supervision - Immunity Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0408 Senior Apartment Facilities - Limitation on Occupancy by Person Convicted of Crime of Violence Senator Robinson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0543 (HB0694/CH0002) Higher Education - Admissions Process - Criminal History (Maryland Fair Access to Education Act of 2017) Senator Conway 2 2 Veto overridden (32-15)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0561 Public Safety - Criminal Injuries Compensation Board - Ineligibility Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0766 (HB1552) Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services - Operators' Licenses and Vehicle Permits Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0853 /CH0792 (HB0860/CH0793) Transitional Supports for Ex-Offenders - Repeal of Restrictions (Maryland Equal Access to Food Act of 2017) Senator Madaleno 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 792
Finance
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0866 /CH0609 (HB1381/CH0608) Adult High School Pilot Program Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 609
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Ways and Means
SB0922 Business Regulation - State Junk Licenses and Trader's Licenses - Applicants Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM