Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Ex-Offenders

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0122 (SB0938)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Sentencing Guidelines - Previously Adjudicated Delinquent
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0476
Title
Income Tax Credit - Employment of Diversion Program Participants (Second Chance Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Ali
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0541
Title
Labor and Employment – Criminal Record Screening Practices (Ban the Box)
Sponsor
Delegate Mosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0678
Title
Criminal Law - Sentencing - Subsequent Offenders (Career Criminal Truth in Sentencing Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0861
Title
Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Facilities - Sex Offenders
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0991 (SB1062)
Title
Weapon Crimes – Detachable Magazines and Regulated Firearms – Possession
Sponsor
Baltimore City Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1029 /CH0146
Title
Criminal Law – Wearing, Carrying, or Transporting Loaded Handgun – Subsequent Offender
Sponsor
Delegate Branch
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1597 /CH0796
Title
Occupational Licenses or Certificates – Application Determinations – Use of Criminal History – Reports
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0938 (HB0122)
Title
Criminal Procedure – Sentencing Guidelines – Previously Adjudicated Delinquent
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1062 (HB0991)
Title
Weapon Crimes - Detachable Magazines and Regulated Firearms - Possession
Sponsor
Baltimore City Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0122 (SB0938) Criminal Procedure - Sentencing Guidelines - Previously Adjudicated Delinquent Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Recommitted to Judiciary (Delegate Vallario)
Judiciary
1/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0476 Income Tax Credit - Employment of Diversion Program Participants (Second Chance Act) Delegate Ali 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0541 Labor and Employment – Criminal Record Screening Practices (Ban the Box) Delegate Mosby 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0678 Criminal Law - Sentencing - Subsequent Offenders (Career Criminal Truth in Sentencing Act) Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0861 Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Facilities - Sex Offenders Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0991 (SB1062) Weapon Crimes – Detachable Magazines and Regulated Firearms – Possession Baltimore City Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1029 /CH0146 Criminal Law – Wearing, Carrying, or Transporting Loaded Handgun – Subsequent Offender Delegate Branch 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 146
Judiciary
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/05/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1597 /CH0796 Occupational Licenses or Certificates – Application Determinations – Use of Criminal History – Reports Delegate Sydnor 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 796
Judiciary
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0938 (HB0122) Criminal Procedure – Sentencing Guidelines – Previously Adjudicated Delinquent Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB1062 (HB0991) Weapon Crimes - Detachable Magazines and Regulated Firearms - Possession Baltimore City Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM