Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Expungement

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0255 /CH0093
Title
Allegany County - Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0282 (SB0229)
Title
Courts - Juveniles - Expungement of Records
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0480
Title
Criminal Procedure - Explanation of Expungement Provisions Relating to Proposed Disposition of Charge
Sponsor
Delegate Stukes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0854 /CH0643 (SB0479)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records - Not Criminally Responsible
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0899 (SB0550)
Title
State Board of Physicians - Disciplinary and Licensure Procedures - Revision
Sponsor
Delegate Kach
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1029 (SB0783)
Title
State Board of Physicians - Naturopathic Doctors
Sponsor
Delegate Oaks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1096 /CH0401 (SB0672)
Title
State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
Delegate Hammen
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1453
Title
Criminal Law - Marijuana - Regulation, Penalties, and Taxation
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1475 (SB1070)
Title
Baltimore County - Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights
Sponsor
Baltimore County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1523
Title
Public Safety - DNA Samples and Records - Collection, Use, Storage, and Expungement
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0229 (HB0282)
Title
Courts - Juveniles - Expungement of Records
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0479 (HB0854/CH0643)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records - Not Criminally Responsible
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0550 (HB0899)
Title
State Board of Physicians - Disciplinary and Licensure Procedures - Revision
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0672 (HB1096/CH0401)
Title
State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
Senator Conway
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0783 (HB1029)
Title
State Board of Physicians - Naturopathic Doctors
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1070 (HB1475)
Title
Baltimore County - Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0255 /CH0093 Allegany County - Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights Allegany County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 93
Appropriations
2/05/2013 - 2:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0282 (SB0229) Courts - Juveniles - Expungement of Records Chair, Judiciary Committee 6 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0480 Criminal Procedure - Explanation of Expungement Provisions Relating to Proposed Disposition of Charge Delegate Stukes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0854 /CH0643 (SB0479) Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records - Not Criminally Responsible Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 643
Judiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0899 (SB0550) State Board of Physicians - Disciplinary and Licensure Procedures - Revision Delegate Kach 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1029 (SB0783) State Board of Physicians - Naturopathic Doctors Delegate Oaks 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1096 /CH0401 (SB0672) State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation Delegate Hammen 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 401
Health and Government Operations
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1453 Criminal Law - Marijuana - Regulation, Penalties, and Taxation Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1475 (SB1070) Baltimore County - Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights Baltimore County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1523 Public Safety - DNA Samples and Records - Collection, Use, Storage, and Expungement Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0229 (HB0282) Courts - Juveniles - Expungement of Records Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 6 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0479 (HB0854/CH0643) Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records - Not Criminally Responsible Senator Gladden 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0550 (HB0899) State Board of Physicians - Disciplinary and Licensure Procedures - Revision Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0672 (HB1096/CH0401) State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation Senator Conway 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0783 (HB1029) State Board of Physicians - Naturopathic Doctors Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB1070 (HB1475) Baltimore County - Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM