Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Community Colleges - Local Bills (F4)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0266 (SB0146)
Title
Chesapeake College - Board of Trustees - Appointment of Members
Sponsor
Caroline County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0290 (SB0147)
Title
Chesapeake College - Authorization of Debt for Capital Projects - Simple Majority Plus One Requirement
Sponsor
Caroline County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0964 /CH0658 (SB0410)
Title
Community Colleges - Grants for English for Speakers of Other Languages Programs
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0146 (HB0266)
Title
Chesapeake College - Board of Trustees - Appointment of Members
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0147 (HB0290)
Title
Chesapeake College - Authorization of Debt for Capital Projects - Simple Majority Plus One Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0410 (HB0964/CH0658)
Title
Community Colleges - Cade Funding Formula - Grants for English for Speakers of Other Languages Programs
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0266 (SB0146) Chesapeake College - Board of Trustees - Appointment of Members Caroline County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0290 (SB0147) Chesapeake College - Authorization of Debt for Capital Projects - Simple Majority Plus One Requirement Caroline County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0964 /CH0658 (SB0410) Community Colleges - Grants for English for Speakers of Other Languages Programs Delegate Hixson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 658
Ways and Means
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0146 (HB0266) Chesapeake College - Board of Trustees - Appointment of Members Senator Colburn 4 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0147 (HB0290) Chesapeake College - Authorization of Debt for Capital Projects - Simple Majority Plus One Requirement Senator Colburn 4 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Budget and Taxation
2/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0410 (HB0964/CH0658) Community Colleges - Cade Funding Formula - Grants for English for Speakers of Other Languages Programs Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM