Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Fairs

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0136 /CH0386 (SB0298)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Montgomery County - Beer Festivals MC 11-14
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0287
Title
Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Brewery Licenses
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0356 /CH0596
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Class 8 Farm Breweries - Festival Licenses
Sponsor
Delegate Barkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1091 /CH0443
Title
Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer Festivals Ho. Co. 09-14
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0226 /CH0280
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Brewing Company Off-Site Permit
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0250 /CH0286
Title
Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Brewery Licenses
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0298 (HB0136/CH0386)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Montgomery County - Beer Festivals
Sponsor
Montgomery County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0420 /CH0499
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Garrett County - Beer Festival Licenses
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0548 /CH0521
Title
Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Special Event (Festival) Beer, Wine and Liquor Permit
Sponsor
Calvert County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1026
Title
Maryland State Fair - Funding Extension
Sponsor
Senator Kasemeyer
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0136 /CH0386 (SB0298) Alcoholic Beverages - Montgomery County - Beer Festivals MC 11-14 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 386
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0287 Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Brewery Licenses Delegate Otto 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0356 /CH0596 Alcoholic Beverages - Class 8 Farm Breweries - Festival Licenses Delegate Barkley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 596
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1091 /CH0443 Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer Festivals Ho. Co. 09-14 Howard County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 443
Economic Matters
3/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0226 /CH0280 Alcoholic Beverages - Brewing Company Off-Site Permit Senator Pinsky 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 280
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0250 /CH0286 Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Brewery Licenses Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 286
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0298 (HB0136/CH0386) Alcoholic Beverages - Montgomery County - Beer Festivals Montgomery County Senators 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0420 /CH0499 Alcoholic Beverages - Garrett County - Beer Festival Licenses Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 499
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0548 /CH0521 Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Special Event (Festival) Beer, Wine and Liquor Permit Calvert County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 521
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1026 Maryland State Fair - Funding Extension Senator Kasemeyer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 2:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/05/2014 - 2:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM