Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Fairs

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0126 (SB0131)
Title
Worcester County - Recycling at Special Events - Exemptions
Sponsor
Delegate Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0704
Title
Off-Track Betting - Maryland State Fairgrounds - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0739 /CH0628
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Nonprofit Beer Festival Permit - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Barkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0815 /CH0497 (SB1116)
Title
Horse Racing - Fair Hill - Arabian Breed Racing Authorization
Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0894 (SB0952)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Carroll County - Sykesville Freedom District Fire Department
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1072 /CH0591 (SB0879/CH0590)
Title
Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Various Licenses
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1156 /CH0416
Title
Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer or Wine Festival License
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1222 (SB0392)
Title
Dorchester County - Recycling at Special Events - Exemptions
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1353 /CH0650
Title
Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Special Event Festival Permit
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1644 /CH0315
Title
Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Racetrack License
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0131 (HB0126)
Title
Worcester County - Recycling at Special Events - Exemptions
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0392 (HB1222)
Title
Dorchester County - Recycling at Special Events - Exemptions
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0624 /CH0417
Title
Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer or Wine Festival License
Sponsor
Calvert County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0625
Title
Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Special Event Festival Beer, Wine, and Liquor Permit - Attendance
Sponsor
Calvert County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0630 /CH0418
Title
Comptroller - Distillery Off-Site Permit and Liquor Festival Permit
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0724 /CH0041
Title
Alcoholic Beverages Article
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0852 /CH0583
Title
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer and Wine Festivals
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0879 /CH0590 (HB1072/CH0591)
Title
Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Various Licenses
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0952 (HB0894)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Carroll County - Sykesville Freedom District Fire Department
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1116 (HB0815/CH0497)
Title
Horse Racing - Fair Hill - Arabian Breed Racing Authorization
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0126 (SB0131) Worcester County - Recycling at Special Events - Exemptions Delegate Carozza 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB0704 Off-Track Betting - Maryland State Fairgrounds - Prohibition Delegate West 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0739 /CH0628 Alcoholic Beverages - Nonprofit Beer Festival Permit - Revisions Delegate Barkley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 628
Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0815 /CH0497 (SB1116) Horse Racing - Fair Hill - Arabian Breed Racing Authorization Cecil County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 497
Ways and Means
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0894 (SB0952) Creation of a State Debt - Carroll County - Sykesville Freedom District Fire Department Carroll County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/12/2016 - 10:00 AM
HB1072 /CH0591 (SB0879/CH0590) Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Various Licenses Delegate Beitzel 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 591
Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1156 /CH0416 Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer or Wine Festival License Calvert County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 416
Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1222 (SB0392) Dorchester County - Recycling at Special Events - Exemptions Delegate Adams 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB1353 /CH0650 Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Special Event Festival Permit Calvert County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 650
Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1644 /CH0315 Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Racetrack License Delegate West 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 315
Economic Matters
4/07/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0131 (HB0126) Worcester County - Recycling at Special Events - Exemptions Senator Mathias 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0392 (HB1222) Dorchester County - Recycling at Special Events - Exemptions Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0624 /CH0417 Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer or Wine Festival License Calvert County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 417
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0625 Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Special Event Festival Beer, Wine, and Liquor Permit - Attendance Calvert County Senators 4 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (141-0)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0630 /CH0418 Comptroller - Distillery Off-Site Permit and Liquor Festival Permit Senator Hershey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 418
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0724 /CH0041 Alcoholic Beverages Article President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 41
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0852 /CH0583 Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer and Wine Festivals Senator Astle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 583
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0879 /CH0590 (HB1072/CH0591) Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Various Licenses Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 590
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0952 (HB0894) Creation of a State Debt - Carroll County - Sykesville Freedom District Fire Department Carroll County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2016 - 2:00 PM
SB1116 (HB0815/CH0497) Horse Racing - Fair Hill - Arabian Breed Racing Authorization Senator Norman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM