Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Fairs

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0270 /CH0284
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Brewing Company Off-Site Permits and Winery Off-Site Permits - Harford County Farm Fair
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0297 /CH0054 (SB0051/CH0055)
Title
Dorchester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer and Wine Festivals
Sponsor
Dorchester County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0708 (SB0443)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Anne Arundel County Fairgrounds
Sponsor
Delegate McConkey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0740 /CH0825 (SB0693/CH0826)
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Website Domain Names
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0752 /CH0131
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Wine Festival License - Repeal
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1120
Title
Land Use - Zoning - Agritourism Activities
Sponsor
Delegate Rey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1401 /CH0169
Title
Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2018
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1406 (SB0872/CH0325)
Title
Vehicle Laws – Special Event Zones – Worcester County
Sponsor
Delegate Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1708
Title
Business Regulation - Amusement Attractions - Maryland Rider Safety Act
Sponsor
Delegate Chang
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1761 (SB0321)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Maryland State Fairgrounds
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0023
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Distilleries - Farmers' Markets and Other Events
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0051 /CH0055 (HB0297/CH0054)
Title
Dorchester County – Alcoholic Beverages – Beer and Wine Festivals
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0321 (HB1761)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Maryland State Fairgrounds
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0443 (HB0708)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Anne Arundel County Fairgrounds
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0872 /CH0325 (HB1406)
Title
Vehicle Laws – Special Event Zones – Worcester County
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0270 /CH0284 Alcoholic Beverages - Brewing Company Off-Site Permits and Winery Off-Site Permits - Harford County Farm Fair Delegate Lisanti 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 284
Economic Matters
2/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0297 /CH0054 (SB0051/CH0055) Dorchester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer and Wine Festivals Dorchester County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 54
Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0708 (SB0443) Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Anne Arundel County Fairgrounds Delegate McConkey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/10/2018 - 9:00 AM
HB0740 /CH0825 (SB0693/CH0826) Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Website Domain Names Delegate Clippinger 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 825
Economic Matters
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0752 /CH0131 Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Wine Festival License - Repeal Harford County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 131
Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1120 Land Use - Zoning - Agritourism Activities Delegate Rey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1401 /CH0169 Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2018 Delegate Beitzel 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 169
Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1406 (SB0872/CH0325) Vehicle Laws – Special Event Zones – Worcester County Delegate Carozza 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1708 Business Regulation - Amusement Attractions - Maryland Rider Safety Act Delegate Chang 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1761 (SB0321) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Maryland State Fairgrounds Delegate West 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/10/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0023 Alcoholic Beverages - Distilleries - Farmers' Markets and Other Events Senator Waugh 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0051 /CH0055 (HB0297/CH0054) Dorchester County – Alcoholic Beverages – Beer and Wine Festivals Senator Eckardt 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 55
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0321 (HB1761) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Maryland State Fairgrounds Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 3:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 3:00 PM
SB0443 (HB0708) Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Anne Arundel County Fairgrounds Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 11:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 11:00 AM
SB0872 /CH0325 (HB1406) Vehicle Laws – Special Event Zones – Worcester County Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 325
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM