Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Family Law -see also- Adoption; Annulment; Divorce; etc

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0001 /CH0004 (SB0002/CH0003)
Title
Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Termination of Parental Rights (Rape Survivor Family Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0306 /CH0179
Title
State Personnel - Rights and Protections for Nursing Mothers
Sponsor
Delegate Krimm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1271
Title
Family Law – Opioid–Exposed Newborns and Parents Addicted to Opioids – Mobile Application (I’m Alive Today App)
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1483 /CH0287
Title
Duties of a Guardian of the Person - Visitation
Sponsor
Delegate Saab
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1507
Title
Compulsory School Attendance - Truancy Violations - Reporting of Neglect
Sponsor
Delegate Angel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1628
Title
Privileged Communications – Mental Health Providers – Exception for Suspected Child Abuse and Neglect
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1736 (SB1140/CH0623)
Title
Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Lot Release
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0002 /CH0003 (HB0001/CH0004)
Title
Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Termination of Parental Rights (Rape Survivor Family Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1140 /CH0623 (HB1736)
Title
Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation – Definition of Child
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1238
Title
Family Law - Grandparent Visitation
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0001 /CH0004 (SB0002/CH0003) Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Termination of Parental Rights (Rape Survivor Family Protection Act) Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 4
Judiciary
1/18/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0306 /CH0179 State Personnel - Rights and Protections for Nursing Mothers Delegate Krimm 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 179
Appropriations
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1271 Family Law – Opioid–Exposed Newborns and Parents Addicted to Opioids – Mobile Application (I’m Alive Today App) Delegate McKay 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1483 /CH0287 Duties of a Guardian of the Person - Visitation Delegate Saab 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 287
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1507 Compulsory School Attendance - Truancy Violations - Reporting of Neglect Delegate Angel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1628 Privileged Communications – Mental Health Providers – Exception for Suspected Child Abuse and Neglect Delegate Hettleman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB1736 (SB1140/CH0623) Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Lot Release Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0002 /CH0003 (HB0001/CH0004) Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Termination of Parental Rights (Rape Survivor Family Protection Act) Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 3
Judicial Proceedings
1/11/2018 - 1:15 PM
Judiciary
SB1140 /CH0623 (HB1736) Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation – Definition of Child Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 623
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1238 Family Law - Grandparent Visitation Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM