Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Farmland

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0284 (SB0963)
Title
Department of Agriculture - Phosphorus Assessment and Management - Study and Economic Impact Analysis
Sponsor
Delegate Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0525
Title
Estate Tax - Qualified Agricultural Property - Repeal of Recapture Provisions
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0575 (SB0221/CH0146)
Title
Farm Area Motor Vehicles - Registration and Authorized Use
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0576
Title
Sustainable Growth and Agricultural Preservation Act of 2012 - Diminution in Value of Real Property - Compensation
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0785
Title
Drones - Unauthorized Surveillance
Sponsor
Delegate George
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0789 (SB0709)
Title
Income Tax Credit - Preservation and Conservation Easements
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0861 (SB0259/CH0287)
Title
Agriculture - Easements - Renewable Energy Generation Facilities
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1437
Title
Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Lot Release - Demonstrated Financial Hardship
Sponsor
Delegate Kach
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1472
Title
Agriculture - Industrial Hemp - Study
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1547
Title
Hunting Licenses - Exemption for Retired Members of the Armed Forces
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0176
Title
Income Tax Credit - Agricultural Land - Diminution in Value of Real Property
Sponsor
Senator Glassman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0221 /CH0146 (HB0575)
Title
Farm Area Motor Vehicles - Registration and Authorized Use
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0259 /CH0287 (HB0861)
Title
Agriculture - Easements - Renewable Energy Generation Facilities
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0324
Title
Estate Tax - Unified Credit
Sponsor
Senator Forehand
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0709 (HB0789)
Title
Income Tax Credit - Preservation and Conservation Easements
Sponsor
Senator Dyson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0892
Title
Maryland Estate Tax - Transfer of Qualified Agricultural Property by a Qualified Recipient
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0963 (HB0284)
Title
Department of Agriculture - Phosphorus Assessment and Management - Study and Economic Impact Analysis
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0966 /CH0574
Title
Charles County and St. Mary's County - Deer Hunting
Sponsor
Senator Dyson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0284 (SB0963) Department of Agriculture - Phosphorus Assessment and Management - Study and Economic Impact Analysis Delegate Eckardt 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/05/2014 - 2:00 PM
HB0525 Estate Tax - Qualified Agricultural Property - Repeal of Recapture Provisions Delegate Fisher 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0575 (SB0221/CH0146) Farm Area Motor Vehicles - Registration and Authorized Use Delegate Jacobs 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Environmental Matters
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0576 Sustainable Growth and Agricultural Preservation Act of 2012 - Diminution in Value of Real Property - Compensation Delegate Fisher 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0785 Drones - Unauthorized Surveillance Delegate George 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0789 (SB0709) Income Tax Credit - Preservation and Conservation Easements Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
HB0861 (SB0259/CH0287) Agriculture - Easements - Renewable Energy Generation Facilities Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Environmental Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1437 Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Lot Release - Demonstrated Financial Hardship Delegate Kach 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1472 Agriculture - Industrial Hemp - Study Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1547 Hunting Licenses - Exemption for Retired Members of the Armed Forces Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0176 Income Tax Credit - Agricultural Land - Diminution in Value of Real Property Senator Glassman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Budget and Taxation
1/29/2014 - 1:45 PM
SB0221 /CH0146 (HB0575) Farm Area Motor Vehicles - Registration and Authorized Use Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 146
Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0259 /CH0287 (HB0861) Agriculture - Easements - Renewable Energy Generation Facilities Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 287
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Environmental Matters
SB0324 Estate Tax - Unified Credit Senator Forehand 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0709 (HB0789) Income Tax Credit - Preservation and Conservation Easements Senator Dyson 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Budget and Taxation
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0892 Maryland Estate Tax - Transfer of Qualified Agricultural Property by a Qualified Recipient Senator Middleton 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0963 (HB0284) Department of Agriculture - Phosphorus Assessment and Management - Study and Economic Impact Analysis Senator Colburn 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB0966 /CH0574 Charles County and St. Mary's County - Deer Hunting Senator Dyson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 574
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/02/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM