Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Farmland

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0014 /CH0216
Title
Hunting Licenses - Exemption for Retired Members of the Armed Forces
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0252 (SB0284)
Title
Jane Lawton Farm-to-School Program - Maryland Homegrown School Lunch Week - Occurrence
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0381 (SB0257)
Title
Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Phosphorus Management Tool
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0540 /CH0015 (SB0122/CH0014)
Title
Public Health - Regulation of Milk Products - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0701 (SB0463)
Title
Agriculture - Cattle, Swine, and Poultry - Use of Antimicrobial Drugs
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0803 /CH0456
Title
Agriculture - Industrial Hemp - Legalization
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0812 /CH0281
Title
Vehicle Laws - All-Terrain Vehicles - Access to Farms
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1075 (SB0470)
Title
Agriculture - Antibiotic Drug Usage - Food-Producing Animals
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0008
Title
Public Health - Regulation of Milk Products - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Getty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0068 /CH0147
Title
Charles County and St. Mary's County - Deer Management Permit
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0122 /CH0014 (HB0540/CH0015)
Title
Public Health - Regulation of Milk Products - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0257 (HB0381)
Title
Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Phosphorus Management Tool
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0284 (HB0252)
Title
Jane Lawton Farm-to-School Program - Maryland Homegrown School Lunch Week - Occurrence
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0463 (HB0701)
Title
Agriculture - Cattle, Swine, and Poultry - Use of Antimicrobial Drugs
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0470 (HB1075)
Title
Agriculture - Antibiotic Drug Usage - Food-Producing Animals
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0766 /CH0197
Title
Agricultural Land Transfer Tax - Rate Determination
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0014 /CH0216 Hunting Licenses - Exemption for Retired Members of the Armed Forces Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 216
Environment and Transportation
2/05/2015 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0252 (SB0284) Jane Lawton Farm-to-School Program - Maryland Homegrown School Lunch Week - Occurrence Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0381 (SB0257) Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Phosphorus Management Tool Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0540 /CH0015 (SB0122/CH0014) Public Health - Regulation of Milk Products - Revisions Delegate Mautz 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 15
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0701 (SB0463) Agriculture - Cattle, Swine, and Poultry - Use of Antimicrobial Drugs Delegate Robinson, S. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/13/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0803 /CH0456 Agriculture - Industrial Hemp - Legalization Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 456
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0812 /CH0281 Vehicle Laws - All-Terrain Vehicles - Access to Farms Delegate Hornberger 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 281
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1075 (SB0470) Agriculture - Antibiotic Drug Usage - Food-Producing Animals Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
SB0008 Public Health - Regulation of Milk Products - Revisions Senator Getty 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
SB0068 /CH0147 Charles County and St. Mary's County - Deer Management Permit Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 147
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/03/2015 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0122 /CH0014 (HB0540/CH0015) Public Health - Regulation of Milk Products - Revisions Senator Eckardt 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 14
Finance
2/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0257 (HB0381) Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Phosphorus Management Tool Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Pinsky)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0284 (HB0252) Jane Lawton Farm-to-School Program - Maryland Homegrown School Lunch Week - Occurrence Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0463 (HB0701) Agriculture - Cattle, Swine, and Poultry - Use of Antimicrobial Drugs Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Pinsky)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0470 (HB1075) Agriculture - Antibiotic Drug Usage - Food-Producing Animals Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0766 /CH0197 Agricultural Land Transfer Tax - Rate Determination Senator Ready 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 197
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM