Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Farmland

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0090 /CH0047
Title
St. Mary's County - Agricultural Land Preservation Program - Installment Purchase Agreements - Repeal
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0156 (SB0295)
Title
Agriculture - Cost-Sharing Program - Sale of Harvested Cover Crops
Sponsor
Delegate Kerr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0510 (SB0964)
Title
Agriculture - Hemp Research and Production - Prohibitions
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0574
Title
Agriculture - License to Produce Hemp - Limitation
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0645 (SB0461/CH0285)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0687 /CH0304 (SB0597/CH0305)
Title
Agriculture - Cost-Sharing Program - Fixed Natural Filter Practices
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0848 /CH0342
Title
Montgomery County - Agricultural Land Transfer Tax - Alterations MC 7-20
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0889 /CH0634 (SB0802/CH0635)
Title
Property Tax - Exemption - Maryland Farm Bureau, Inc.
Sponsor
Delegate Bagnall
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1176
Title
Agriculture - Maryland Healthy Soils Grant Program
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1362
Title
Harford County - Transfer Tax - Distribution of Proceeds
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1438
Title
Agriculture – Processing of Poultry Litter for Alternative Use
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0242 /CH0542
Title
Natural Resources - Wild Waterfowl Policy - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0295 (HB0156)
Title
Agriculture - Cost-Sharing Program - Sale of Harvested Cover Crops
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0351
Title
Agriculture - Farmers Markets - Advertising, Labeling, and Enforcement (Farmers Market Integrity Act)
Sponsor
Senator Gallion
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0461 /CH0285 (HB0645)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0597 /CH0305 (HB0687/CH0304)
Title
Agriculture - Cost-Sharing Program - Fixed Natural Filter Practices
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0802 /CH0635 (HB0889/CH0634)
Title
Property Tax - Exemption - Maryland Farm Bureau, Inc.
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0964 (HB0510)
Title
Agriculture - Hemp Research and Production - Prohibitions
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1035
Title
Hemp Farming Program - Expansion - Processing Hemp
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0090 /CH0047 St. Mary's County - Agricultural Land Preservation Program - Installment Purchase Agreements - Repeal St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 47
Environment and Transportation
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0156 (SB0295) Agriculture - Cost-Sharing Program - Sale of Harvested Cover Crops Delegate Kerr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0510 (SB0964) Agriculture - Hemp Research and Production - Prohibitions Delegate Hettleman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0574 Agriculture - License to Produce Hemp - Limitation Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0645 (SB0461/CH0285) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond Carroll County Delegation 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Appropriations
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0687 /CH0304 (SB0597/CH0305) Agriculture - Cost-Sharing Program - Fixed Natural Filter Practices Delegate Stein 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 304
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0848 /CH0342 Montgomery County - Agricultural Land Transfer Tax - Alterations MC 7-20 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 342
Ways and Means
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0889 /CH0634 (SB0802/CH0635) Property Tax - Exemption - Maryland Farm Bureau, Inc. Delegate Bagnall 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 634
Ways and Means
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1176 Agriculture - Maryland Healthy Soils Grant Program Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/21/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1362 Harford County - Transfer Tax - Distribution of Proceeds Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB1438 Agriculture – Processing of Poultry Litter for Alternative Use Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0242 /CH0542 Natural Resources - Wild Waterfowl Policy - Repeal Senator Bailey 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 542
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/29/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0295 (HB0156) Agriculture - Cost-Sharing Program - Sale of Harvested Cover Crops Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0351 Agriculture - Farmers Markets - Advertising, Labeling, and Enforcement (Farmers Market Integrity Act) Senator Gallion 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0461 /CH0285 (HB0645) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond Carroll County Senators 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 285
Budget and Taxation
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0597 /CH0305 (HB0687/CH0304) Agriculture - Cost-Sharing Program - Fixed Natural Filter Practices Senator Young 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 305
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0802 /CH0635 (HB0889/CH0634) Property Tax - Exemption - Maryland Farm Bureau, Inc. Senator Reilly 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 635
Budget and Taxation
2/18/2020 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0964 (HB0510) Agriculture - Hemp Research and Production - Prohibitions Senator Hettleman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB1035 Hemp Farming Program - Expansion - Processing Hemp Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/27/2020 12:54 PM