Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Fertilizers

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0058 (SB0112/CH0006)
Title
Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0511 /CH0367
Title
Maryland Commercial Fertilizer Law - Definition of Soil Conditioner - Alteration
Sponsor
Delegate Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0904 (SB0546/CH0760)
Title
Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Monitoring and Enforcement
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0954 /CH0178
Title
Agriculture - Commercial Compost - Prohibition on Per Ton Inspection Fee
Sponsor
Delegate Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0112 /CH0006 (HB0058)
Title
Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0546 /CH0760 (HB0904)
Title
Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Monitoring and Enforcement
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0058 (SB0112/CH0006) Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions Speaker 6 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/25/2019 - 2:00 PM
HB0511 /CH0367 Maryland Commercial Fertilizer Law - Definition of Soil Conditioner - Alteration Delegate Cassilly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 367
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0904 (SB0546/CH0760) Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Monitoring and Enforcement Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0954 /CH0178 Agriculture - Commercial Compost - Prohibition on Per Ton Inspection Fee Delegate Cassilly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 178
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0112 /CH0006 (HB0058) Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions President 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 6
Rules
2/13/2019 - 11:00 AM
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/04/2019 - 2:00 PM
SB0546 /CH0760 (HB0904) Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Monitoring and Enforcement Senator Pinsky 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 760
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:24 PM