Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Fiduciaries

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0083 /CH0585 (SB0240)
Title
Maryland Trust Act
Sponsor
Delegate Simmons
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0705 (SB0940/CH0207)
Title
Victims of Crime - Legal Representatives of Minors and Disabled and Elderly Persons
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1225 (SB0886/CH0354)
Title
Legal Mutual Liability Insurance Society of Maryland - Conservatorship and Transfer
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1270 (SB0914)
Title
Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0240 (HB0083/CH0585)
Title
Maryland Trust Act
Sponsor
Senator Stone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0886 /CH0354 (HB1225)
Title
Legal Mutual Liability Insurance Society of Maryland - Conservatorship and Transfer
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0914 (HB1270)
Title
Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0940 /CH0207 (HB0705)
Title
Victims of Crime - Legal Representatives of Minors and Disabled and Elderly Persons
Sponsor
Senator Stone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0083 /CH0585 (SB0240) Maryland Trust Act Delegate Simmons 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 585
Judiciary
1/22/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0705 (SB0940/CH0207) Victims of Crime - Legal Representatives of Minors and Disabled and Elderly Persons Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1225 (SB0886/CH0354) Legal Mutual Liability Insurance Society of Maryland - Conservatorship and Transfer Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1270 (SB0914) Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0240 (HB0083/CH0585) Maryland Trust Act Senator Stone 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0886 /CH0354 (HB1225) Legal Mutual Liability Insurance Society of Maryland - Conservatorship and Transfer Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 354
Finance
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0914 (HB1270) Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0940 /CH0207 (HB0705) Victims of Crime - Legal Representatives of Minors and Disabled and Elderly Persons Senator Stone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 207
Judicial Proceedings
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM