Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Fiduciaries

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0524 /CH0815 (SB0291/CH0816)
Title
Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0777 (SB0649)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1012 /CH0727 (SB0899/CH0728)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Investment Division
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, B.
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0291 /CH0816 (HB0524/CH0815)
Title
Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0649 (HB0777)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0898 (HB0993/CH0769)
Title
Maryland Pension Climate Change Risk Act
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0524 /CH0815 (SB0291/CH0816) Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody Delegate Moon 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 815
Judiciary
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0777 (SB0649) Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1012 /CH0727 (SB0899/CH0728) State Retirement and Pension System - Investment Division Delegate Barnes, B. 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 727
Appropriations
2/22/2018 - 3:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2018 - 9:00 AM
SB0291 /CH0816 (HB0524/CH0815) Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody Senator Madaleno 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 816
Judicial Proceedings
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0649 (HB0777) Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse Senator Kelley 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0898 (HB0993/CH0769) Maryland Pension Climate Change Risk Act Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 8:30 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/22/2018 - 8:30 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM